Mulder v. MCDANIEL et al
Case Number: 3:2009cv00610
Filed: October 15, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus Office
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Robert A. McQuaid
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER granting ECF No. 194 Motion to Extend Time. Respondents' Reply in Support of the Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 174 ) is due March 5, 2021. Respondents' Responses to the Motions for Discovery (ECF No. 185 ) and an Evid entiary Hearing (ECF No. 187 ) are due March 5, 2021. In all other respects, the schedule set forth in the Court's Order of May 2, 2019 (ECF No. 162 ), remains in effect. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/8/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER granting ECF No. 192 Motion to Extend Time. Respondents' Reply in Support of their Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 174 ) is due January 4, 2021. Respondents' Responses to the Motions for Discovery (ECF No. 185 ) and an Ev identiary Hearing (ECF No. 187 ) are due January 4, 2021. In all other respects, the schedule set forth in the Court's Order of May 2, 2019 (ECF No. 162 ) remains in effect. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER granting ECF No. 190 Motion to Extend Time. Respondents' Reply in Support of their Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 174 ) is due November 2, 2020. Respondents' Responses to the Motions for Discovery (ECF No. 185 ) and an Evidentiary Hearing (ECF No. 187 ) are due November 2, 2020. In all other respects, the schedule set forth in the Court's Order of May 2, 2019 (ECF No. 162 ) remains in effect. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER that petitioner's motion to extend time to file his response to respondents' motion to dismiss and to file motions for discovery and an evidentiary hearing (ECF No. 179 ) is GRANTED. The response and motions are due July 31, 2020. In all other respects, the schedule set forth in the court's order of May 2, 2019, remains in effect. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/19/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting ECF No. 177 Motion to Extend Time. The response and motions are due June 16, 2020. In all other respects, the schedule set forth in the courts order of May 2, 2019, remains in effect. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 172 Motion to Extend Time. The response to the second amended petition is due February 17, 2020. In all other respects, the schedule set forth in the court's order of May 2, 2019 (ECF No. 162 ) remains in effect. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER - ECF No. 170 Motion to Extend Time is granted. ECF No. 169 Motion to Extend Time is denied as moot. Defendants' Answers/Responses due 1/16/2020. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/16/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB) Modified on 12/16/2019 for font (AB).
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER that petitioner's motion to extend time to file his second amended petition for writ of habeas corpus [ECF No. 163 ] is GRANTED. The second amended petition is due 8/15/2019. In all other respects, the schedule set forth in the court's order of May 2, 2019 (ECF No. 162 ) remains in effect. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 159 Motion to Lift Stay and Setting Deadlines : Amended Petition due by 7/1/2019. (See pdf order for additional deadlines.) Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/2/2019. (Case stay lifted.) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER denying Respondents' 99 motion to dismiss; denying without prejudice Petitioner's 116 motion for summary judgment; granting Petitioner's 117 motion for stay and abeyance. This action is stayed while Petitioner exhausts his unexhausted claims in state court. Petitioner shall file and serve a status report on or before 12/15/2014 and every 6 months thereafter during the stay; Respondents may respond within 15 days, and petitioner may reply within 15 days. Petitioner shall have 30 days to initiate the appropriate state court proceeding if he has not yet done so. Within 30 days following the conclusion of state court proceedings, petitioner shall make a motion to lift the stay. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 9/8/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDERED that petitioner's # 109 Motion for permission to appeal is DENIED. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 11/13/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER denying 96 Motion for Reconsideration. Petitioner's response to 99 Motion to dismiss due by 11/22/2013. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 10/23/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Respondents shall file response to amended petition 7 on or before 8/1/2013. Petitioner may move for stay any time prior to that date. On or before 6/10/2013, parties shall file joint statement advising the court whether they wish to engage in further settlement discussions and, if so, whether they want the magistrate judge assigned to this case to assist with those discussions. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 5/1/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
September 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDERED that P's # 18 Motion to stay federal habeas corpus proceedings is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 9/26/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDERED that each party shall file a pre-hearing brief as discussed above on or before June 20, 2011. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that each party shall file its response to the other partys brief on or before June 30, 2011. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 6/8/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic status conference shall be held on Tuesday, 02/01/2011 at 2:30 p.m. Counsel shall be available at their respective numbers ten minutes prior to the time set for the conference. To make other arrangeme nts, counsel shall contact Donna Andrews (702) 464-5426. FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall confer with one another in advance of the status conference, and shall attempt to reach agreement regarding each of the matters to be addressed at the conference. (See Order for specifics)(Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/1/2011 2:30 PM in LV before Judge Philip M. Pro.) Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 1/11/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING Rs' 23 Motion for psychological examination. FURTHER ORD Rs shall designate expert(s) by 5/25/2010. FURTHER ORD Rs shall have their experts complete examination by 7/9/2010. FURTHER ORD GRANTING Rs' 25 Motion for extension of time : Rs' response to 18 / 19 Motion due by 8/8/2010; P's reply due 20 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 5/10/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mulder v. MCDANIEL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?