Veterinary Ventures, Inc. v. Farris
Case Number: 3:2009cv00732
Filed: December 14, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER APPROVING 61 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Veterinary Ventures, Inc. IT IS ORDERED that this action in its entirety is dismissed without prejudice. Case terminated. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/19/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that P's 32 Motion to Exceed Page Limitations is GRANTED. FURTH ORD that P's 18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. FURTH ORD that D's 6 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED AS MOOT. FURTH ORD that P's 20 Motion for Leave is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/3/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PM)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 PROTECTIVE ORDER re confidential information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 6/30/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying 40 Motion to Vacate settlement conference; granting 41 Motion for authorization to file documents electronically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 6/15/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN) Modi fied on 6/15/2010 to reflect SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL PROCEED ON 6/22/10 @ 9:00 A.M. as scheduled. NEF Regenerated with corrected PDF. (BLG). (Main Document 44 replaced with corrected PDF on 6/15/2010) (BLG).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veterinary Ventures, Inc. v. Farris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?