Freeto v. Litton Loan Servicing LP et al
Case Number: 3:2009cv00754
Filed: December 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER denying 74 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. See order for specifics. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/4/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EM)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that defendant's motion to dismiss 45 is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that defendant's motion to dismiss 49 is GRANTED. Defendant Litton Loan Servicing LP is DISMISSED as a defendant as to the remanded claims: (1) claim 1 for unfair lending practices; (2) claim 12 for unjust enrichment; (3) claim 3 for injunctive relief; and, (4) claim 4 for declaratory relief. FURTHER ORDERED that defendants' motion to dismiss 50 is GRANTED. Defendants Bank of Ne w York Mellon and J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. are DISMISSED as defendants as to the remanded claims: (1) claim 1 for unfair lending practices; (2) claim 12 for unjust enrichment; (3) claim 3 for injunctive relief; and, (4) claim 4 for declaratory relief. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 1/12/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' 67 motion to strike is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/15/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDERED that D's 4 Motion to dismiss is GRANTED. D Lime Financial Services, LTD is DISMISSED as a defendant as to the remanded claims: (1) claim 1 for unfair lending practices; (2) claim 12 for unjust enrichment; (3) claim 3 for injunctive re lief; and (4) claim 4 for declaratory relief. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that D's 24 Motion to dismiss is GRANTED. D Quality Loan Service Corporation is DISMISSED as a defendant as to the remanded claims:(1) claim 1 for unfair lending practices; (2) claim 12 for unjust enrichment; (3) claim 3 for injunctive relief; and (4) claim 4 for declaratory relief. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 7/6/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER LIFTING STAY. IT IS ORDERED that the stay in case no. 3:09-cv-00754-LRH-VPC entered on March 5, 2010, is hereby LIFTED. FURTHER ORDERED, defendants have twenty (20) days after the issuance of this order to answer or otherwise respond to the remanded claims. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/22/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 25 defendants' Motion to Stay pending a decision of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all proceedings in this case are stayed pending Judge Teilborg's order to remand defendants and claims back to this court. See order re specifics. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/5/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 12 plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court and denying as moot 13 plaintiff's Motion to Stay pending the motion to remand. See order re specifics. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 1/25/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
December 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER APPROVING 18 Stipulation between Plaintiff and Defendants Merscorp, Inc. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., for an extension of time up to and including 1/31/2010 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. ( Responses due by 1/31/2010.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/31/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER APPROVING 8 Stipulation between plaintiff and defendants Litton Loan Servicing LP Bank Of New York, JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association for an extension of time for said defendants to file their answers or other responsive pleadings.( Responses due by 1/29/2010.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/30/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeto v. Litton Loan Servicing LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?