McConnell vs E. K. McDaniel, et al
Case Number: 3:2010cv00021
Filed: January 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Presiding Judge: Robert A. McQuaid
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:1651 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting ECF No. 121 Motion to Extend Time. Respondents' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 122 ) will be treated as timely filed. In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered December 4, 2019 (ECF No. 91 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/3/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting ECF No. 119 Motion to Extend Time. Respondents will have until and including May 27, 2021, to file their renewed Motion to Dismiss. In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered December 4, 2019 (ECF No. 91 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/21/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting ECF No. 117 Motion to Extend Time (Second Request). Respondents will have until and including May 20, 2021, to file their renewed motion to dismiss. In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered December 4, 2019 (ECF No. 91 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/26/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER - Respondents' Motion for Enlargement of Time (ECF No. 115 ) is granted. Respondents will have until and including April 22, 2021, to file their renewed Motion to Dismiss. In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered December 4, 2019 (ECF No. 91 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/5/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion to Strike, or, in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement (ECF No. 107 ) is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Respondents' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 105 ) is DENIED, without prejudice to Respondents filing a new motion to dismiss. FURTHER ORDERED that Respondents will have 30 days from the date of this order (4/1/2021) to file their new motion to dismiss. In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedin gs set forth in the order entered on December 4, 2019 (ECF No. 91 ) will remain in effect. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is directed to update the docket for this case to reflect that Aaron Ford has been substituted for Adam Paul Laxalt as the respondent state attorney general. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/2/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER - Petitioner's Motion to Stay Scheduling Order (ECF No. 108 ) is granted. Petitioner will not be required to respond to the motion to dismiss (ECF No. 105 ) until the motion to strike or for more definite statement (ECF No. 107 ) is resolved. The Court will set a schedule for Petitioner's response to the motion to dismiss, if necessary, when the motion to strike or for more definite statement is resolved. Respondents shall respond to the Motion to Strike, or, in the Al ternative, Motion for More Definite Statement (ECF No. 107 ) on or before January 15, 2021. Petitioner will then have 10 days to reply. The Court will not look favorably upon any motion to extend this briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting ECF No. 103 Motion to Extend Time. Respondents will have until and including October 8, 2020, to file their response to the Petitioner's Second Amended Habeas Petition (ECF No. 95 ). In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered December 4, 2019 (ECF No. 91 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting ECF No. 101 Motion to Extend Time. Respondents will have until and including October 1, 2020, to file their response to the Second Amended Petition (ECF No. 95 ). In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered December 4, 2019 (ECF No. 91 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER that Respondents' motion for extension of time (ECF No. 99 ) is GRANTED. Respondents will have until and including September 10, 2020, to file their response to the petitioner's second amended habeas petition. In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered December 4, 2019 (ECF No. 91 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting ECF No. 97 Unopposed Motion for Temporary Relief From LR IC 2-2(g). Within 60 days after the Court rescinds General Orders 2020-5, 2020-4 and 2020-3, or as otherwise ordered, the parties will be required to bring their compl iance with LR IC 2-2(g) up to date by submitting to the Court - to the Clerk's Office in Reno - courtesy copies of all documents filed under this order to which LR IC 2-2(g) would apply. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDERED that Petitioner's motion for extension of time (ECF No. 92 ) is GRANTED. Petitioner will have until and including April 3, 2020, to file his second amended habeas petition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered December 3, 2019 (ECF No. 91 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting ECF No. 88 Petitioner's Motion to Vacate Stay and Reopen Capital Habeas Proceedings; the stay of this action is lifted; the following schedule herein shall govern the further proceedings in this action. See order pdf for further details and instructions. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Denying 39 Motion For Compliance With Rule 2 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases. FURTHER ORDERED that respondents shall have 45 days from the date this order is entered to file and serve an answer or other response to the amend ed petition (docket #24). FURTHER ORDERED that, in all other respects, the schedule set forth in the order entered August 23, 2010 (docket #21), shall remain in effect. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/15/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that P shall file and serve an amend pet for whc on or before December 3, 2010. Rs shall have 60 days following svc of the amend pet to file and serve and answer. If P does not filean amend pet, R s shall have 60 days following the due-date for the amend pet to file and serve an answer or other response to the orig pet. P shall have 45 days following svc of an answer to file and serve a reply. Rs shall thereafter have 30 days< /B> following svc of a reply to file and serve a response to the reply. If Rs file a mtn to dismiss, P shall have 30 days following svc of the mtn to file and serve an oppo to the mtn. Rs shall thereafter have 30 days following svc of t he oppo to file and serve a reply. P shall have 20 days to file and serve a reply in support of the mtn for leave to conduct disc. If the court grants P leave to conduct disc, the court will then establish time limits for the completion of the auth disc. If P wishes to request an evidentiary hrg, P shall file and serve a mtn for an evidentiary hrg concurrently with, but separate from, the resp to Rs mtn to dismiss or the reply to Rs answer. P shall have 20 days to file and serve a reply in support of the mtn for an evidentiary hrg. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/23/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PM)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDERED that a Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 8/13/2010 09:00 AM re whether the completed state-court record has been obtained. Counsel shall be prepared to discusss the schedule for further litigation of this action. ( see pdf order for specifics ) Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/3/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McConnell vs E. K. McDaniel, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?