Grimes v. Fourth Judicial District Court et al
Petitioner: Jerome L. Grimes
Respondent: Elko, County Of, Fourth Judicial District Court, Nevada Attorney General, Nevada, State Of and Mark Torvinen
Case Number: 3:2010cv00391
Filed: June 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 10/25/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. The clerk of court shall enter judgment accordingly. FURTHER ORDERED that a certificate of appealability is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/20/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court's 7 Order is VACATED. Case reopened. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/24/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. The clerk of the court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/16/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that P shall file an ifp app w/fin cert and stmt of inmate acct. Clerk shall send blank ifp w/instr to P (sent on 8/11/2010) In the alt, P shall make pymt of $5.00 f/f. P shall have 30 days from the date that this order is entered to comply. Failure to comply will result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/11/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grimes v. Fourth Judicial District Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Elko, County Of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Fourth Judicial District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada, State Of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mark Torvinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jerome L. Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?