Volpicelli v. United States
Defendant: United States
Petitioner: Logan R. Volpicelli
Case Number: 3:2010cv00548
Filed: September 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Nature of Suit: Taxes: Customer Challenge
Cause of Action: 26:7426 IRS: Wrongful Levy for Taxes
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting # 52 Motion to Continue District Judge Hearing : Status Conference set for 7/6/2015; time changed to 1:30 PM in Reno Courtroom 6 before Judge Robert C. Jones. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/23/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that P's 27 Motion for Relief from Order is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/7/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PM)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the 12 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and all other pending motions are DENIED as moot. Judgement is hereby entered in favor of the defendant and against plaintiff. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 7/5/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO) Modified on 7/6/2011 (KO)to correct hyperlink.
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 12 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and all other pending motions are DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED, the Clerk shall enter judgment and close the case accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/5/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall FILE the Complaint. This order granting in forma pauperis shall not extend to the issuance of subpoenas at government expense. FURTHER ORDERED the Clerk shall issue summons to defendant(s) and deliver to the USM for service. Clerk shall send plaintiff copies of the complaint and USM Form 285 for each defendant (ack'd). Plaintiff shall have twenty (20) days to furnish USM the forms. Within twenty (20) days after receiving from the USM a copy of the USM-285 form showing whether service has been accomplished, plaintiff mustfile a notice with the court identifying which defendants were served and which were not serv ed. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall serve a copy of every pleading upon defendants. ( Notice of Compliance is due by 11/10/2010.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 10/19/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC) Modified on 10/21/2010 (MLC).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Volpicelli v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Logan R. Volpicelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?