de Grise v. Bagus et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin W. de Grise
Defendant: Colleen Bagus and Carol Stewart
Case Number: 3:2010cv00662
Filed: October 21, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 32 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/27/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 7/18/2012. By Deputy Clerk: Katie Ogden. Plaintiff's Motion "Demand for Evidence" 34 is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDERED that P's # 26 Motion to Proceed in Quo Warranto and # 28 Motion for Summary Judgment are DENIED. FURTHER ORD P's amended complaint due by 5/11/2012, titled as "AMENDED COMPLAINT" with case number above. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/10/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Ps 13 motion to proceed, which the court construes as a motion for leave to file an amended complaint, is GRANTED. P shall have thirty (30) days to file an amended complaint. FURTH ORD that Ps 15 motion t o proceed, 16 motion to transfer venue, 20 motion to proceed, and 22 motion to proceed are DENIED. FURTH ORD that Ds 11 motion to dismiss is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/25/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PM)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall FILE the complaint (ack'd). FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue summons to defendants and deliver same to USM. The Clerk shall send p laintiff sufficient copies of the Complaint and USM Form 285 for each defendant (ack'd). Plaintiff shall have twenty (20) days to furnish the USM the USM-285. Plaintiff must file a notice with the Court identifying which defendants were served and which were not. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall serve a copy of all pleadings upon defendants. (See Order for specifics). (Notice of Compliance is due by 11/30/2010.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 11/30/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff shall file an Affidavit re: additional financial information no later than Friday, 11/19/2010 4:00 PM. (Notice of Compliance is due by 11/19/2010.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 10/25/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: de Grise v. Bagus et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen Bagus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin W. de Grise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?