Parker's Model T et al v. Silver Club et al
Plaintiff: The Holder Group Elko, LLC, Silver Club, The Holder Group El Capitan, Inc. and Parker's Model T
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, First National Bank of Nevada, Ashan S Perera and Phillip Potamitis
Case Number: 3:2010cv00791
Filed: December 20, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Presiding Judge: Robert A. McQuaid
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying 49 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/22/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant FDIC's Motion to Dismiss 33 and Defendants Potamitis and Perera's Motion to Dismiss and Joinder in FDIC Motion to Dismiss 37 are hereby GRANTED without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend 40 is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/2/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. This action is referred to Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt for reassignment. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 12/21/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker's Model T et al v. Silver Club et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Holder Group Elko, LLC
Represented By: David L. McGee
Represented By: Gregory R Miller
Represented By: Gloria M Petroni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silver Club
Represented By: David L. McGee
Represented By: Gregory R Miller
Represented By: Gloria M Petroni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Holder Group El Capitan, Inc.
Represented By: David L. McGee
Represented By: Gregory R Miller
Represented By: Gloria M Petroni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parker's Model T
Represented By: Gregory R Miller
Represented By: David L. McGee
Represented By: Gloria M Petroni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Allen J Wilt
Represented By: Michael D. Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Bank of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashan S Perera
Represented By: David R. Grundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Potamitis
Represented By: David R. Grundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?