Randolph v. McDaniel et al
Petitioner: Clyde Lewis
Respondent: E. K. McDaniel and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2011cv00077
Filed: February 3, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying 21 amended petition for writ of habeas corpus. Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close case. Certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/30/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying Petitioner's 35 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/11/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDERED that Rs' # 25 Motion to dismiss is GRANTED in part with respect to the claim of ineffective assistance of appellate counsel in ground 2. FURTHER ORD P shall have until 9/25/2014 to inform court re dismissal of claim, amended petitio n, exhaustion or move to stay; as specified herein. FURTHER ORD if P elects to dismiss specified claim, then Rs' response to remaining grounds due 45 days after service of declaration dismissing those grounds. FURTHER ORD if Rs file and serve an answer, then P shall have 45 days thereafter to file and serve a reply. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/26/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 17 Motion to Extend Time; denying as moot 19 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; and denying 20 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Respondents have 45 days to answer petition. Exhibit s filed by the parties shall be filed in accordance with attached order. Hard copy shall be forwarded to staff attorneys in Las Vegas. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/17/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER This action is REINSTATED. Clerk shall send petitioner petition for writ of habeas corpus form with instructions (sent 3/25/13). Petitioner shall have 30 days to file amended petition in accordance with the terms outlined in attached order. Case reopened. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/25/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randolph v. McDaniel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clyde Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: E. K. McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?