State of Nevada v. Bank of America Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Nevada, State Of
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America National Association, Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Full Spectrum Lending, Inc., Reconstruct Company, N.A. and BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP
Case Number: 3:2011cv00135
Filed: February 23, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Presiding Judge: Robert A. McQuaid
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER - Nevada's 119 appeal has neither divested the court of jurisdiction nor effected a stay of proceedings. The status conference/hearing calendared for Thursday, February 2, 2012, at 8:00 a.m. shall proceed as scheduled. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 1/31/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDERED that the # 56 Motion to Change Venue is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the # 63 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing set for November 15, 2011 is VACATED . Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/13/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the 18 Motion to Remand is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/5/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 THIRD PARTY PROTECTIVE ORDER re 32 Stipulated Motion for Entry of Third Party Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. on 5/16/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PROTECTIVE ORDER re 30 Stipulated Motion for Entry of a Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. on 5/1/6/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Nevada v. Bank of America Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Matthew W. Close
Represented By: Vincent C Ferenbach
Represented By: Leslie Bryan Hart
Represented By: John D Tennert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America National Association
Represented By: Matthew W. Close
Represented By: Vincent C Ferenbach
Represented By: Leslie Bryan Hart
Represented By: John D Tennert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Financial Corporation
Represented By: Matthew W. Close
Represented By: Vincent C Ferenbach
Represented By: Leslie Bryan Hart
Represented By: John D Tennert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew W. Close
Represented By: Vincent C Ferenbach
Represented By: Leslie Bryan Hart
Represented By: John D Tennert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Full Spectrum Lending, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew W. Close
Represented By: Vincent C Ferenbach
Represented By: Leslie Bryan Hart
Represented By: John D Tennert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reconstruct Company, N.A.
Represented By: Matthew W. Close
Represented By: Vincent C Ferenbach
Represented By: Leslie Bryan Hart
Represented By: John D Tennert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP
Represented By: John D Tennert
Represented By: Leslie Bryan Hart
Represented By: Vincent C Ferenbach
Represented By: Matthew W. Close
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nevada, State Of
Represented By: Ernest D Figueroa
Represented By: Binu Palal
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Segal
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?