Laperla v. Partner's Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Pearl A Laperla
Defendant: Partner's Mortgage Corporation, Power Default Services, Inc., Option One, Fidelity Nation Title Insurance Company and American Home Mortgage Servicing
ThirdParty Defendant: The Guardian Alliance Incorporated, The New Earth Stewardship Coalition, The Phurba Merchant Group, Pearl Laperla Living Family Trust and Joshua-Carl
Intervenor Plaintiff: Edith Hofmeister
ThirdParty Plaintiff: Fidelity National Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2011cv00167
Filed: March 4, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 62 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Case terminated. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/6/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting 62 Motion for Summary Judgment. Fidelity shall submit a proposed form of judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/26/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion for Request for Re-Hearing due to Lack of Notice 38 is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/5/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDERED that Hofmeister's # 8 Motion to Intervene is GRANTED. FURTHER ORD that Hofmeister's # 9 Motion for Hearing to Expunge Lis Pendens is GRANTED and, the notice of lis pendens is cancelled and P is ordered to file a copy of this ord er of cancellation with the Washoe County Recorder's office. FURTHER ORD that P's # 15 Motion to Remand is DENIED. FURTHER ORD that Fidelity's # 23 Ex Parte Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order on Order Shortening Time is GRANTE D. Laperla and third-party Ds are restrained (as specified herein, see pdf order for specifics). FURTHER ORD that Fidelity's # 24 Ex Parte Motion for an Order Shortening Time is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/28/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 4/29/2011 (DRM).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laperla v. Partner's Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: The Guardian Alliance Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: The New Earth Stewardship Coalition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: The Phurba Merchant Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Pearl Laperla Living Family Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Joshua-Carl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partner's Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Default Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Option One
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Nation Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Marni Rubin Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Mortgage Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pearl A Laperla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Edith Hofmeister
Represented By: James M Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty plaintiff: Fidelity National Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Marni Rubin Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?