Debarr v. Carpentar et al
Defendant: Tara Carpenter, Stephen Clark, Greg Cox, Ellie Emmanuel, Don Helling, Nevada State of, ex rel, Jack Palmer and Kirk Widmar
Petitioner: Brian Joel Debarr
Case Number: 3:2012cv00039
Filed: January 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Edward C. Reed
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting ECF No. 137 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Settlement. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Defendants' ECF No. 104 Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment be denied. Objections to R&R due by 6/2/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER that Defendants' Motion Leave to File Documents Under Seal ECF No. 108 is DENIED as to Exhibits H, I, J, K and L. Clerk directed to UNSEAL those exhibits. Defendants' motion is GRANTED with respect to Exhibit N, which is to remain sealed. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 01/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting 99 Amended Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 11/2/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDERED that Debarr's Motion for Reconsideration (ECF No. 89 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 7/30/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER adopting and accepting 48 Report and Recommendation and granting 35 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Plaintiff's request for a delay in considering Defendants' motion under FRCivP 56(d); dismissing wit h prejudice Plaintiff's remaining federal claims. The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's state law claims. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 03/06/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER - 45 Motion to Strike is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/26/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying 33 -1 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 6/26/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING 19 Motion for consolidation. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 1/15/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the stay previously entered herein is lifted and that, within twenty-one (21) days of entry of this order, the Attorney General's Office shall file a notice advising the Court and plaintiff of:(a) the names of the defen dant(s) for whom it accepts service; (b) the names of the defendant(s) for whom it does not accept service, and (c) the names of the defendant(s) for whom it is filing last-knownaddress information under seal. As to any of the named defendant(s) for whom the Attorney General'sOffice cannot accept service, the Office shall file, under seal, the last known address(es) of those defendant(s) for whom it has such information. If service cannot be accepted for any of the named defendant(s), plain tiff shall file a motion identifying the unserved defendant(s). If the Attorney General accepts service of process for any named defendant(s), such defendant(s) shall file and serve an answer or other response to the complaint within sixty (60) days from the date of this order. (See Order for specifics)(Notice of Compliance is due by 9/4/2012. Response/Answer due 10/13/2012) Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/4/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Debarr v. Carpentar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Carpenter
Represented By: Troy C Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Clark
Represented By: Troy C Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Cox
Represented By: Troy C Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellie Emmanuel
Represented By: Troy C Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Helling
Represented By: Troy C Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada State of, ex rel
Represented By: Troy C Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Palmer
Represented By: Troy C Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Widmar
Represented By: Troy C Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brian Joel Debarr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?