Moonin et al v. State of Nevada Department of Public Safety, Highway Patrol Division (NHP) et al

Plaintiff: Erik Lee, Matt Moonin and Donn Yarnall
Defendant: Clark, County Of, Donald Dice, Todd Ellison, Mel English, Pat Gallagher, Doug Gillespie, Charles Haycox, Tom Higgins, Thom Jackson, Dale Jaeger, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Las Vegas, City Of, Ben Leonard, Dave Lewis, Makor K-9, Chris Perry, Jim Peterson, Wayne Prosser, Ervin Raab, Mark Rispoli, Brian Sanchez, Hugh Shook, State of Nevada Department of Public Safety, Highway Patrol Division (NHP), John Stewart, Kevin Tice, Luis Zapata and Greg Zeil
Case Number: 3:2012cv00353
Filed: June 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER granting ECF No. 199 Stipulation for dismissal of Matt Moonin's First Amendment claim in its entirety, with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorney's fees and costs. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER denying without prejudice 178 Motion for Attorney Fees and granting 180 Motion to Stay. Pursuant to 189 Order, parties shall file a joint pretrial order within 30 days of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals' order on qualified immunity. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER overruling 139 Objection; granting in part and denying in part 157 Motion for Summary Judgment; and granting in part and denying in part 159 Motion for Summary Judgment. Formal statement of death for Plaintiff Yarnall due within 14 days. Clerk shall enter judgment for Plaintiff Moonin on prior restraint claim and for Defendant Tice on prior restraint claim brought by Plaintiffs Lee and Yarnall. Joint Pretrial Order due within 45 days. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 7/2/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDERED that defendants' emergency # 145 Motion to quash deposition subpoenas is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 11/4/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 115 / 118 Motion to Dismiss; granting 116 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting 123 Motion for Leave to File Pleading in Excess of Thirty Pages; granting 128 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 01/16/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER re 111 Stipulation of Dismissal. Makor K-9 and Mark Rispoli terminated. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 06/07/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDERED that Plaintiffs' # 95 Objections to the Magistrate Judge's ruling are DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' # 73 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and State of Nevada defendants' ## 37 , 87 Motions for Le ave to File Excess Pages are GRANTED nunc pro tunc. ORDERED that State of Nevada defendants' # 99 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/9/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER GRANTING 31 , 32 , and 33 Motions to Dismiss; GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 38 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs are granted leave to amend their complaint, provided that the amended complaint does not exceed 30 pages and provided the amended complaint is filed within 20 days of the date of this order's filing. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 04/13/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moonin et al v. State of Nevada Department of Public Safety, Highway Patrol Division (NHP) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark, County Of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Dice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mel English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Gillespie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Haycox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thom Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Jaeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas, City Of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Makor K-9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Prosser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ervin Raab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Rispoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh Shook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada Department of Public Safety, Highway Patrol Division (NHP)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Tice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Zapata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Zeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Lee
Represented By: Kenneth J. McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Moonin
Represented By: Kenneth J. McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donn Yarnall
Represented By: Kenneth J. McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?