Companion Property and Casualty Group v. Consolidated Agent Partners et al

Plaintiff: Companion Property and Casualty Group
Defendant: Consolidated Agency Partners, Karen Faust, Highpoint Risk Services, LLC, Gloria Lam, Pinnacle Underwriters, Inc, Risk Placement Services, Inc., Sky High Sports Orange County Operation LLC, Sky High Sports, LLC, Joan Vascones and Rolland Waddell
Case Number: 3:2012cv00595
Filed: November 9, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Howard D. McKibben
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 20, 2016 387 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re ECF Nos. 381 , 386 Notices of Bankruptcy, staying case pending resolution of Defendants' bankruptcy petitions or until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 5/20/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 5, 2016 373 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT - Judgment is entered in favor of the plaintiff Companion Property and Casualty Group and against defendants Sky High, LLC, and Sky High Sports Orange County Operations, LLC, in the amount of $3,485,000.00, together with prejudg ment interest in the amount of $253,825.81, attorney's fees in the amount of $109,538.18, costs in the amount of $34,228.20, and postjudgment interest at the legal rate. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 2/5/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 12, 2015 357 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Sky High's ex parte # 356 Motion for an order shortening time is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file a response to Sky High's # 355 Motion to quash writs of execution on or before Monday, November 16, 2015, and Sky High shall file any reply on or before Wednesday, November 18, 2015. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 11/12/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 29, 2015 332 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 331 Stipulation : Response to 327 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs due by Friday 11/6/2015. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 10/29/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 29, 2015 325 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of the plaintiff Companion Property and Casualty Group and against defendants Sky High LLC and Sky High Sports Orange County Operations LLC in the amount of $3,485,000.00, together with prejudgment interest in the amount of $248,127.23 and postjudgment interest at the legal rate. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 9/29/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 21, 2015 315 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Jury Trial (Day Five) held on 9/21/2015 before Judge Howard D. McKibben. Crtrm Administrator: Paris Rich; Plaintiff's Counsel: Gina Mushmeche and Jordan Schnitzer; Defendants' Counsel: Day Willia ms and Natalia Vander Laan; Court Reporter: Kathryn French; Time of Hearing: 8:30 AM to 5:07 PM; Courtroom: 4;See attached Minutes. Jury Verdicts entered. IT IS ORDERED, the Plaintiff shall prepare a proposed Judgment consistent with the findings of the Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PR)
April 16, 2015 234 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PREPARATION OF JURY INSTRUCTIONS. See attached Order. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 4/16/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PR)
February 27, 2015 223 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Absent objection from Highpoint on or before March 6, 2015, the court will sign and enter plaintiff's proposed order (# 122 Reply Ex. A) and direct that the settlement of the parties be reduced to judgment. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 2/27/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 29, 2015 220 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Plaintiff's 212 Motion to Enforce Settlement. Defendant Highpoint Risk Services' opposition due by 2/18/2015. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 1/29/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 23, 2015 217 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re # 215 MOTION to Extend Time : The court will set a date for the opposition to be filed after consideration of the motion to withdraw and the designation of new counsel. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 1/23/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 24, 2014 210 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment 170 is denied. Faust's motion for summary judgment 165 is granted as to plaintiff's claims of breach of fiduciary duty, constructive fraud and detriment al reliance and is denied in all other respects.Sky High's motion for summary judgment 168 is granted as to plaintiff's claim of detrimental reliance and denied in all other respects. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 6/24/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
January 2, 2014 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 166 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiff's # 167 Motion for partial summary judgment in excess of 30 pages is STRICKEN. Plaintiff shall have up to and including January 7, 2014, in which to file a motion for summary judgment in compliance with LR 7-4. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 1/2/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 27, 2013 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 103 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order and denying as moot 121 Motion for Leave to File Supplement. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 8/27/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
May 28, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - RPS and CAP defendants' motions to dismiss (# 14 , # 15 ) are DENIED AS MOOT; the motions to dismiss (# 48 , # 49 ) are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to renew as a motion for summary judgment at the close of discovery. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 5/28/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 5/28/2013 for spelling (DRM).
March 13, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Amended Complaint deadline: 3/27/2013. Should plaintiff fail to file amended complaint, pending motions to dismiss shall stand submitted. Please see attached for further details. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 3/13/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
January 18, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Defendant's 23 Motion to Extend Time is GRANTED . Said defendants shall have up to and including 1/29/2013 in which to file their reply. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 1/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JK)
January 11, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 19 Motion to Extend Time. Defendants Risk Placement Services, Inc., Joan Vascones, and Gloria Lams shall have up to and including 1/18/13 in which to file their reply.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Companion Property and Casualty Group v. Consolidated Agent Partners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Companion Property and Casualty Group
Represented By: Michael B. Johnson
Represented By: Martin J. Kravitz
Represented By: Jordan P Schnitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidated Agency Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Faust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highpoint Risk Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Underwriters, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Risk Placement Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sky High Sports Orange County Operation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sky High Sports, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Vascones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolland Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?