England v. Foster et al

Plaintiff: William England
Defendant: Sheryl Foster, Shannon Moyle, James Stogner and Lisa Walsh
Case Number: 3:2013cv00188
Filed: April 16, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 28, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting and accepting 61 Report and Recommendation, granting 52 Motion for Summary Judgment, and directing Clerk to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/28/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
March 23, 2015 60 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 3/23/2015, granting Plaintiff's 57 Motion to Attach; striking Plaintiff's 46 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 2, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING AND ACCEPTING # 44 Report and Recommendation : # 30 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is denied. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/2/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 3, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: INFORMAL SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS. The clerk shall provide a courtesy copy of this order and the complaint to defendants' counsel (e-served 10/3/2013). Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 10/02/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: England v. Foster et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William England
Represented By: c/o Librarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Moyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Stogner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?