American Civil Liberties Union Of Nevada et al v. United States General Services Administration et al

Plaintiff: Erik Holland, American Civil Liberties Union Of Nevada and Robert Tregilus
Defendant: Ruth Cox, Rebecca Saroyan, Lynette Preku and United States General Services Administration
Case Number: 3:2013cv00189
Filed: April 16, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 9, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the Clerk shall close this case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/9/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 2, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiffs to file an amended version of the complaint within 7 days or the case will be dismissed with prejudice under Rule 41(b). Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/2/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 10, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the # 6 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED, with leave to amend. FURTHER ORDERED that the # 11 Motion for Leave to Amend is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Civil Liberties Union Of Nevada et al v. United States General Services Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Holland
Represented By: Katrina M. Rogers
Represented By: Staci J. Pratt
Represented By: Allen Lichtenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union Of Nevada
Represented By: Katrina M. Rogers
Represented By: Staci J. Pratt
Represented By: Allen Lichtenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Tregilus
Represented By: Allen Lichtenstein
Represented By: Staci J. Pratt
Represented By: Katrina M. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Saroyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynette Preku
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States General Services Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?