Bancinsure, Inc. v. Jacobs et al
Plaintiff: Bancinsure, Inc.
Defendant: Daniel Dykes, Charlie Glenn, James Michael Jacobs, Richard McCole and Byron Waite
Case Number: 3:2013cv00302
Filed: June 7, 2013
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER that the stay is LIFTED, and the parties shall SUBMIT any renewed motions for summary judgment by 3/21/2017. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 03/08/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW).
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDERED that the Motions for Summary Judgment (ECF Nos. 182 , 185 ) are DENIED without prejudice, and the case is STAYED. The parties shall notify the Court upon the issuance of the mandate in Court of Appeals Case No. 14-56132. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/27/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER denying 167 Motion to Certify and granting 173 Stipulation to File Corrected Response. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/26/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 164 Amended ORDER (amending 163 Order) denying 136 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/29/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting 125 Motion to Stay; denying as moot 123 Motion to Stay. The case is stayed until 12/19/2014. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/25/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting 125 Motion to Stay; denying as moot 123 Motion to Stay. The case is stayed until 12/19/2014. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/12/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER re 78 -2 proposed Joint Stipulated ESI Protocol. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 01/16/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDERED that the FDICs # 18 Motion to Substitute Parties is GRANTED. The FDIC is substituted as party for defendants Dykes, Waite, and McCole to the extent these defendants have assigned their rights against BancInsure to the FDIC. FURTHER ORDERED that the FDIC may file its Answer and Counterclaims within 15 days of the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/29/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bancinsure, Inc. v. Jacobs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bancinsure, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew B. Downs
Represented By: Kristol Bradley Ginapp
Represented By: Loren D Podwill
Represented By: Margaret M Van Valkenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Dykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlie Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Michael Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard McCole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byron Waite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?