Marian K. Porter vs Shyam K. Chetal, et al
Plaintiff: Marian K Porter
Defendant: Shyam K Chetal individually and doing business as Advantage Real Estate Pro, Smarttouch Systems, Inc. and United Capital Investment, Inc. doing business as Nevada United Capital Investments, Inc.
Not Yet Classified: Shyam K Chetal doing business as Advantage Real Estate Pro
Cross Defendant: George C Schwelling and Walter J. Antonell
Case Number: 3:2013cv00661
Filed: December 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P Cooke
Referring Judge: Larry R Hicks
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2018 Filing 109 NOTICE of Change of Address, filed by Defendant Shyam K Chetal (clerk has responded to request for certified copy of docket sheet and mailed same). OLD: 2090 Warmsprings Court, #180, Fremont, CA 94539 and NEW: 45319 Whitetail Court, Fremont, CA 94539. (KW)
May 1, 2017 Filing 108 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re ECF No. #106 Order Dismissing Case, addressed to Shyam Chetal. (KW)
March 27, 2017 Filing 107 JUDGMENT is hereby entered in favor of plaintiff Marian K. Porter and against defendants Shyam K. Chetal and United Capital Investments, Inc., in the amount of two-hundred million dollars ($200,000,000.00). Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 3/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDERED that plaintiff Marian K. Porter is granted partial summary judgment against defendants Shyam K. Chetal and United Capital Investments, Inc., for damages on her breach-of-contract claim in the amount of two-hundred million dollars ($200,000,000.00). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of the court shall enter judgment in favor of plaintiff Marian K. Porter and against defendants Shyam K. Chetal and United Capital Investments, Inc., in the amount of two-hundred million dollars ($200,000,000.00). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of the court shall close this case. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 13, 2017 Filing 105 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re ECF No. #104 Order, addressed to Shyam K. Chetal. (KR)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER denying Plaintiff's ECF No. #100 Motion for Judgment; giving Defendants Shyam Chetal and United Capital Investments Inc 21 days to show cause as to why the Court should not grant Porter summary judgment (see order for details); directing Clerk to mail a copy of this order to Chetal's last known address (mailed 3/1/2017). Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 24, 2017 Filing 103 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re ECF No. #97 Minute Order, addressed to Shyam Chetal. (KW)
February 21, 2017 Filing 102 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #100 Motion for Judgment by Plaintiff Marian K Porter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kozak, Charles)
February 17, 2017 Filing 101 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re ECF No. 99 Minutes of proceedings, addressed to Shyam K. Chetal. (DRM)
February 15, 2017 Filing 100 MOTION for Judgment Entry by Plaintiff Marian K Porter. Responses due by 3/1/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kozak, Charles)
February 8, 2017 Filing 99 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Telephonic Status Conference held on 2/8/2017 before Judge Larry R. Hicks. Crtrm Administrator: J. Cotter; Pla Counsel: Charles Kozak; Def Counsel: None Appearing; Court Reporter: Donna Davidson; Time of Hearing: 10:18 a.m. - 10:27 a.m.; Courtroom: 3. Upon inquiry, Plaintiff's counsel advises the Court as to the status of this case. Good cause appearing, Plaintiff shall file a motion for entry of judgment no later than February 18, 2017. Plaintiff's counsel shall make a good faith attempt to ascertain the availability and address of Defendant, Shyam Chetal, and to serve him with that motion. Defendant shall file a response no later than February 28, 2017. Replies, if filed, shall be due no later than March 3, 2017. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
February 8, 2017 Filing 98 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re ECF No. #93 Notice re 41-1 Dismissal addressed to Shyam Chetal. (KW)
January 24, 2017 Filing 97 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks, on 1/24/2017. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 02/08/2017 at 10:00 A.M., in Reno Courtroom 3 before Judge Larry R. Hicks. Telephonic participants shall call AT&T no later than five (5) minutes prior to the hearing at 1 (888) 273-3658, and provide Access Code 9260179 and Security Code 020817. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's counsel shall make a good faith attempt to ascertain the availability and address of Shyam K. Chetal, and to provide him with a copy of this order. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
December 9, 2016 Filing 96 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re ECF No. #95 Order, addressed to Shyam K. Chetal. (KR)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDERED that plaintiff Marian Porter's motion to voluntarily dismiss her remaining claims without prejudice (ECF No. #94 ) is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all of Porter's remaining claimsfraud, negligence, breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing, and tortious breach of contractare dismissed without prejudice as to Shyam Chetal, Smarttouch Systems, Inc., and United Capital Investments, Inc.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Porter, Chetal, and United shall submit a proposed joint pretrial order by 1/12/2017. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/28/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 7, 2016 Filing 94 MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice by Plaintiff Marian K Porter. Responses due by 10/24/2016. (Kozak, Charles)
September 19, 2016 Filing 93 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41-1. If no action is taken in this case within 30 days, the Court will enter an order of dismissal for want of prosecution. LR 41-1 dismissal deadline set for 10/19/2016. (KW)
July 25, 2016 Filing 92 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks, on 7/25/2016, directing the parties to file a status report within 30 days. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER on Mandate as to #90 USCA Mandate USCA Case 15-15584. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/9/16. (JC)
February 26, 2016 Filing 90 MANDATE of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #66 USCA Judgment. USCA case 15-15584.(DRM)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER denying Chetal's #76 Motion to Reconsider; denying as moot Chetal's #83 Motion to Extend Time to File Objections; overruling Chetal's #85 Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Orders. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/24/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 10, 2015 Filing 88 RESPONSE to #85 Objections re LR IB 3-1 or Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order,, filed by Plaintiff Marian K Porter. Replies due by 8/20/2015. (Kozak, Charles)
August 5, 2015 Filing 87 RESPONSE to #85 Objections re LR IB 3-1 or Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order, ; Response to Chetal's Objections to Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation filed by Cross Defendants Walter J. Antonell, George C Schwelling. (Olsen, Karl)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, confirming 5/19/2015 order dismissing appeal for lack of jurisdiction, denying motion for reconsideration, denying as moot all other pending motions as to #53 Notice of Appeal. USCA case 15-15584. (KR)
July 20, 2015 Filing 85 OBJECTIONS re LR IB 3-1 or MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order, re #82 Minutes of Proceedings - Defendant's Objections to Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation, by Defendant Shyam K Chetal. Responses due by 8/6/2015. (KR)
July 17, 2015 Filing 84 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, #82 Motion Hearing, held on 7/7/15, before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Donna Davidson, 775-329-0132. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's Transcript Order form available on our website, at www.nvd.uscourts.gov, before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 8/7/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2015. (DD)
July 15, 2015 Filing 83 MOTION to Extend Time to File Objections to #82 Order, by Defendant Shyam K Chetal. (DRM)
July 7, 2015 Filing 82 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motions Hearing held on 7/7/2015 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Crtrm Administrator: LGM; Pla Counsel: Charles Kozak; Third-Party Defendants: Karl Olsen; Def Counsel: Mark Lapham (By telephone) and Shyam Chetal; Court Reporter/FTR #: 9:59:49 - 11:24:50; Time of Hearing: 9:59 a.m.; Courtroom: 1; Mr. Chetal's oral request to have Jim Doherty speak on his behalf is DENIED. Mr. Lapham's motion to withdraw as defendant's counsel #72 is GRANTED. Mr. Lapham is excused from participating in this proceeding. Defendant's motions and requests #47 , #58 , #59 , #63 , #65 , #67 , #74 , and #77 are all DENIED. Defendant's motion #52 is DENIED as moot. Defendant's motion #60 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants shall have until no later than Friday, August 7, 2015, to retain new counsel. See that attached order for specifications. THEREAFTER, the Court finds #81 is STRICKEN. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM) Modified on 7/8/2015 to reflect the correct date for the hearing. (LGM)
July 7, 2015 Filing 81 STRICKEN PER ORDER #82 NOTICE Filing Request Judicial Notice. (DRM) Modified on 7/8/2015 (LGM).
July 2, 2015 Filing 80 REPLY to Response to #76 Motion for Relief from Judgment and to Vacate Judgment, filed by Defendant Shyam K Chetal. (JC)
June 29, 2015 Filing 79 RESPONSE to #77 Motion, filed by Plaintiff Marian K Porter. Replies due by 7/9/2015. (Kozak, Charles)
June 15, 2015 Filing 78 RESPONSE to #76 Motion to Vacate, filed by Plaintiff Marian K Porter. Replies due by 6/25/2015. (Kozak, Charles)
June 10, 2015 Filing 77 MOTION - Fifth Request for Judicial Notice of Certified Official Records of Clerk of U.S. District Court of California of Attorney Mark Lapham..., by Defendant Shyam K Chetal. Responses due by 6/27/2015. (KR)
June 1, 2015 Filing 76 MOTION for Relief from Judgment..., re #44 Order, by Defendant Shyam K Chetal. (KR)
May 29, 2015 Filing 75 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 5/29/2015. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. Mr. Lapham's motion to vacate June 2nd motion hearing at 2:00 PM #70 is GRANTED. The Motions Hearing currently set for 6/2/2015 at 02:00 PM is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for 7/7/2015 at 10:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Mr. Lapham and Mr. Chetal shall both be allowed to appear telephonically for this hearing. The deputy court clerk shall initiate the conference call. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF and mailed to Shyam K. Chetal at 2090 Warmsprings Ct., Ste. 180, Fremont, CA 94539 on May 29, 2015 - LGM)
May 28, 2015 Filing 74 MOTION to Vacate Hearing Set by Order of May 20, 2015 for Hearing on Pending Motions...Request for Specially Set Contempt Hearing Before U.S. District Judge Hicks re 69 Minute Order, by Defendant Shyam K Chetal. (JC)
May 26, 2015 Filing 73 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #70 Motion to Vacate by Defendant Shyam K Chetal, Cross Complainant Shyam K Chetal. (Lapham, Mark) Modified on 5/27/2015 add link to motion #72 (WJ).
May 26, 2015 Filing 72 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Mark Lapham by Defendant Shyam K Chetal, Cross Complainant Shyam K Chetal. (Lapham, Mark)
May 26, 2015 Filing 71 RESPONSE to #65 Motion, #63 Motion, #67 Motion, filed by Plaintiff Marian K Porter. Replies due by 6/5/2015. (Kozak, Charles)
May 21, 2015 Filing 70 MOTION to Vacate 69 Minute Order Setting Hearing on Motion,,, by Defendant Shyam K Chetal, Cross Complainant Shyam K Chetal. (Lapham, Mark)
May 20, 2015 Filing 69 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 5/20/2015. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. A Motions Hearing regarding motion to transfer #47 , motion to postpone trial #52 , motion #58 , motion to stay discovery #59 , motion #60 , request #63 , second request #65 , third request #67 and to discuss the status of Mark Lapham's continued representation of defendants is set for 6/2/2015 at 02:00 PM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Mr. Lapham and Mr. Chetal shall both be allowed to appear telephonically for this hearing. The deputy court clerk shall initiate the conference call. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM) Modified on 5/20/2015 to reflect 69 mailed to Shyam K. Chetal at 2090 Warmsprings Ct., Ste. 180, Fremont, CA 94539 on May 20, 2015. (LGM)
May 18, 2015 Filing 68 REPLY to Response to #58 Motion, #59 Motion to Stay, and #60 Motion, filed by Defendant Shyam K Chetal. (JC)
May 14, 2015 Filing 67 MOTION - Third Request for Judicial Notice of Disbarment of Mark W. Lapham..., filed pro se by Defendant Shyam K. Chetal. Responses due by 5/31/2015. (KR)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #53 Notice of Appeal (USCA Case 15-15584), dismissing appeal for lack of jurisdiction. (JC)
May 8, 2015 Filing 65 MOTION - Second Request for Judicial Notice of Disbarment Records of Mark W. Lapham..., filed pro se by Defendant Shyam K Chetal. Responses due by 5/25/2015. (KR)
May 8, 2015 Filing 64 RESPONSE to #58 Motion, #60 Motion,, filed by Plaintiff Marian K Porter. Replies due by 5/18/2015. (Kozak, Charles)
May 6, 2015 Filing 63 MOTION - Request for Judicial Notice of Disbarment of Mark W. Lapham by the United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces..., filed pro se by Defendant Shyam K Chetal. Responses due by 5/23/2015. (KR)
May 4, 2015 Filing 62 SUPPLEMENT to #60 Pro Hac Vice Application by Defendant Shyam K Chetal, Cross Complainant Shyam K Chetal. (Lapham, Mark) Modified on 5/5/2015 add link to motion. (WJ).
April 28, 2015 Filing 61 RESPONSE to #58 Motion,, filed by Cross Defendants Walter J. Antonell, George C Schwelling. Opposition to Defendant/Third Party Plaintiff Shyam Chetal's "Motion and Affidavit of Shyam Chetal in Support of Filing Amended Answer-Defense of 'Due Diligence' of Answers of 2/11/14 as Complete Defense to Claims of Breach of Contract to Finish Motions in U.S. District of Court Nevada, and Motion to Stay all Discovery" Replies due by 5/8/2015. (Olsen, Karl)
April 27, 2015 Filing 60 MOTION - Verified Motion in Support of Defendant Shyam K. Chetal's Motion for Stay of All Discovery Pursuant Fed.R.Civ.P.26(c)(2), Request for Extension of Time Through June 15, to Comply with Local Rules 16-3, 16-4 - by Defendant Shyam K Chetal. Responses due by 5/14/2015. (JC)
April 22, 2015 Filing 59 MOTION to Stay all Discovery, by Defendant Shyam K Chetal. Image identical to #58 Motion. (JC)
April 22, 2015 Filing 58 MOTION - Motion and Affidavit of Defendant Shyam Chetal in Support of Filing Amended Answer-Defense of "Due Diligence" of Answers of 2/11/14 as Coplete Defense to Claims of Beach of Contract to Finish Motions in U.S. District of Court Nevada - by Defendant Shyam K Chetal. Responses due by 5/9/2015. (JC)
April 8, 2015 Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 4/8/2015, re letter returned. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 3, 2015 Filing 56 REPLY to #48 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,, Minute Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines, ; Response to order to comply with local rule filed by Defendant Shyam K Chetal, Cross Complainant Shyam K Chetal. (Lapham, Mark)
March 26, 2015 Filing 55 USCA TIME SCHEDULE ORDER and civil docketing letter as to #53 Notice of Appeal. USCA case number 15-15584 assigned. (DRM)
March 25, 2015 Filing 54 FORMS - Designation of Transcripts and Transcript Order forms for #53 Notice of Appeal. The forms may also be obtained on the Court's website at #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. (KR)
March 25, 2015 Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #44 Order, by Defendant Shyam K Chetal. Filing fee $505 - PAID, receipt NVRNO-2768. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Notice of Appeal NEF and PACER docket sheet sent to D 3/25/2015.) (KR)
March 23, 2015 Filing 52 MOTION to Extend Time - to postpone trial - by Defendant Shyam K Chetal. (JC)
March 19, 2015 Filing 51 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #44 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines, ; filed by Defendants Shyam K Chetal, Smarttouch Systems, Inc., United Capital Investment, Inc., Plaintiff Marian K Porter. (Kozak, Charles)
March 19, 2015 Filing 50 STIPULATION for Withdrawal of Mark Lapham, Esq. and Substitution of Plaintiff Pro Se (note on first page indicates Shyam Chetal does not agree with stipulation). (JC) Modified on 4/13/2015 (DN).
March 16, 2015 Filing 49 RESPONSE to #47 MOTION to Transfer, filed by Plaintiff Marian K Porter. Replies due by 3/26/2015. (Kozak, Charles)
March 6, 2015 Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 3/6/2015, granting #45 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Hal Taylor withdrawn from the case. Mark Whitney Lapham, Esq. shall have unti Friday, April 3, 2015 to comply with Local Rule IA 10-2(d) and associate member of the Bar of this Court as co-counsel. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
February 27, 2015 Filing 47 MOTION to Transfer Case to San Francisco and to Postpone Case, by Defendant Shyam K Chetal. Responses due by 3/16/2015. (JC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/27/2015: #1 Ins Card) (JC).
February 24, 2015 Filing 46 LETTER to the Court from Defendant Shyam Chetal re #45 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (KR)
February 11, 2015 Filing 45 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Hal Taylor by Cross Complainant Shyam K Chetal. (Taylor, Hal)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDERED that Porter's #39 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. FURTHER ORDERED that Chetal's #41 Request for additional discovery is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a proposed joint pretrial order by 3/20/2015. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/2/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 21, 2014 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to #39 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Marian K Porter. (Kozak, Charles)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend. Any amended complaint shall be filed within 20 days. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/15/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
October 6, 2014 Filing 41 RESPONSE to #39 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Defendants Shyam K Chetal, Smarttouch Systems, Inc., United Capital Investment, Inc., Cross Complainant Shyam K Chetal. Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment Replies due by 10/23/2014. (Lapham, Mark)
October 6, 2014 Filing 40 RESPONSE to #39 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Cross Defendants Walter J. Antonell, George C Schwelling. Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment Replies due by 10/23/2014. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Olsen, Karl)
September 10, 2014 Filing 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Marian K Porter. Responses due by 10/4/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Kozak, Charles)
August 14, 2014 Filing 38 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 8/14/2014 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Crtrm Administrator: LGM; Pla Counsel: Charles Kozak; Def Counsel: Mark Lapham (By telephone); Court Reporter/FTR #: 2:08:53 - 2:28:45; Time of Hearing: 2:08 p.m.; Courtroom: 1; The Court and counsel discuss the third-party defendants' motion to stay discovery #32 . Third-party defendants' motion to stay discovery #32 is GRANTED. If some iteration of the third-party complaint survives the motion to dismiss, counsel shall have thirty (30) days to file a proposed discovery plan and scheduling order limited specifically to the issues in the third-party complaint. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
August 12, 2014 Filing 37 AFFIDAVIT re #32 MOTION to Stay Motion to Stay Discovery ; filed by Cross Defendants Walter J. Antonell, George C Schwelling. Affidavit of Counsel in Support of Reply to Opposition to Motion to Stay Discovery (Olsen, Karl)
August 12, 2014 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to #32 MOTION to Stay Motion to Stay Discovery filed by Cross Defendants Walter J. Antonell, George C Schwelling. Reply to Opposition to Motion to Stay Discovery (Olsen, Karl)
August 7, 2014 Filing 35 RESPONSE to #32 MOTION to Stay Motion to Stay Discovery, filed by Defendants Shyam K Chetal, Smarttouch Systems, Inc., United Capital Investment, Inc., Cross Complainant Shyam K Chetal. OPPOSITION Replies due by 8/17/2014. (Lapham, Mark)
August 4, 2014 Filing 34 NON-OPPOSITION to #32 MOTION to Stay Motion to Stay Discovery ; filed by Plaintiff Marian K Porter. Kozak, Charles (Kozak, Charles)
August 4, 2014 Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 8/4/2014. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. A Motion Hearing regarding third-party defendants' motion to stay discovery #32 is set for 8/14/2014 at 02:00 PM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Oppositions shall be filed by no later than the close of business on Thursday, August 7, 2014, and the reply shall be filed by no later than the close of business on Tuesday, August 12, 2014. Out-of-state counsel shall be allowed to appear telephonically and shall advise Lisa Mann at (775)686-5653 at least two (2) days prior of the telephone number at which counsel can be reached for this motion hearing. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
July 30, 2014 Filing 32 MOTION to Stay Motion to Stay Discovery by Cross Defendants Walter J. Antonell, George C Schwelling. Motion ripe 7/30/2014. (Olsen, Karl)
July 3, 2014 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to #24 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint filed by Cross Defendants Walter J. Antonell, George C Schwelling. Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint (Olsen, Karl)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying #5 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/27/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
June 26, 2014 Filing 29 RESPONSE to #24 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint, filed by Defendant Shyam K Chetal, Cross Complainant Shyam K Chetal. Opposition Replies due by 7/6/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lapham, Mark)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying #18 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/25/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
June 23, 2014 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Shyam K Chetal, Shyam K Chetal. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Lapham, Mark)
June 19, 2014 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Marian K Porter. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case /s/ Charles R. Kozak. (Kozak, Charles)
June 12, 2014 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Walter J. Antonell, George C Schwelling. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case Certificate as to Interested Parties. (Olsen, Karl)
June 9, 2014 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint by Cross Defendants Walter J. Antonell, George C Schwelling. Responses due by 6/26/2014. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 6/19/2014. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/24/2014. (Olsen, Karl)
May 15, 2014 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to #18 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Defendant Shyam K Chetal. (Lapham, Mark)
May 14, 2014 Filing 22 SUMMONS ISSUED as to George C. Schwelling, Walter J. Antonell. ( Attachments: #1 as to Walter J. Antonell )(DRM)
May 13, 2014 Filing 21 THIRD PARTY CROSS-COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract against Antonell J Walter, George C Schwelling, filed by Shyam K. Chetal et al. Antonell J Walter, George C Schwelling. Adds new parties. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/23/2014. (Lapham, Mark) Modified on 5/14/2014 to correct document title and filing party(DRM).
May 13, 2014 Filing 20 PROPOSED SUMMONS - THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against George C Schwelling, Antonell J Walter, filed by Shyam K Chetal. Adds new parties. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/23/2014. (Lapham, Mark) Modified on 5/14/2014 to correct document description (DRM).
May 5, 2014 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #18 MOTION to Change Venue , filed by Plaintiff Marian K Porter. Defendants' Replies due by 5/15/2014. (Kozak, Charles)
April 23, 2014 Filing 18 MOTION to Change Venue by Defendants Shyam K Chetal, Smarttouch Systems, Inc., United Capital Investment, Inc.. Responses due by 5/10/2014. (Lapham, Mark)
April 15, 2014 Filing 17 NOTICE of Docket Correction to #16 Non-Opposition having been filed in error. Clerk will line through incorrect docket event along with incorrect attached PDF. Counsel has been instructed to mail Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge to Clerk's Office for proper processing. (no image attached)(BLG)
April 14, 2014 Filing 16 NON-OPPOSITION to #9 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mark W. Lapham and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Hal Taylor (Filing fee $ 200) ; filed by Defendant Shyam K Chetal. Consent to Magistrate Judge (Lapham, Mark) Modified on 4/15/2014 See (# 17 )(BLG).
April 10, 2014 Filing 15 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take three (3) days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (KR)
April 9, 2014 Filing 14 (1st Notice) PURSUANT TO SPECIAL ORDER 109: that Mark W. Lapham is in violation of Special Order 109. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) program and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website to register for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (LG)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER re #11 Joint Case Management Report. Discovery due by 8/11/2014. Motions due by 9/10/2014. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/10/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 4/9/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
April 9, 2014 Filing 12 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Case Management Conference held on 4/9/2014 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Crtrm Administrator: LGM; Pla Counsel: Charles Kozak; Def Counsel: Mark Lapham (By telephone); Court Reporter/FTR #: 11:01:18 - 11:19:11; Time of Hearing: 11:01 a.m.; Courtroom: 1; The Court approves the parties' proposed discovery plan and scheduling order as outlined in the joint case management report #11 . The deputy court clerk is directed to attach the notice, consent, and reference of a civil action to a Magistrate Judge to the minutes of this proceeding. Mr. Lapham shall have until Wednesday, April 23, 2014, to file a motion for change of venue. (Attachments: #1 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
March 31, 2014 Filing 11 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by Plaintiff Marian K Porter.(Kozak, Charles) Modified on 4/9/2014 to reflect the correct title of document. (LGM)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER approving #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark W. Lapham for Shyam K Chetal and approving Designation of Local Counsel Hal Taylor. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/29/14. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
March 27, 2014 Filing 9 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mark W. Lapham and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Hal Taylor (Filing fee $ 200 - Paid; Receipt Number NVRNO-2222), by Defendant Shyam K Chetal. Motion ripe 3/27/2014. (JC)
March 4, 2014 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 3/4/2014. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. A case management conference is set for 4/9/2014 at 11:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. The parties shall jointly file a case management report by no later than the close of business on Monday, March 31, 2014. See the attached order for specifications. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
February 27, 2014 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Plaintiff Marian K Porter. Shyam K. Chetal, et al Replies due by 3/9/2014. (Kozak, Charles)
February 11, 2014 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by United Capital Investment, Inc..(Taylor, Hal)
February 11, 2014 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Smarttouch Systems, Inc.. Responses due by 2/28/2014. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 2/21/2014. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/28/2014. (Taylor, Hal)
February 11, 2014 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Shyam K Chetal. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 2/21/2014. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/28/2014.(Taylor, Hal)
January 22, 2014 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United Capital Investment, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (JC)
December 4, 2013 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shyam K. Chetal re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 SUMMONS ISSUED as to United Capital Investment, #2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Smarttouch Systems)(KR)
December 3, 2013 Case assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. (WJ)
December 3, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shyam K Chetal, United Capital Investment, Inc., Smarttouch Systems, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-3052621), filed by Marian K Porter. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 12/13/2013. Proof of service due by 4/2/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5 Porter v Chetal, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Marian K. Porter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet Porter v Chetal, #4 Summons Summons Chetal invdiv and Advantage Real Estate Pro, #5 Summons Summons United Capital Investment, Inc., #6 Summons Summons Smarttouch Systems, Inc., #7 Declaration Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Disclosure Statement) (Kozak, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marian K. Porter vs Shyam K. Chetal, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Shyam K Chetal doing business as Advantage Real Estate Pro
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Represented By: Mark Whitney Lapham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian K Porter
Represented By: Charles R. Kozak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shyam K Chetal individually and doing business as Advantage Real Estate Pro
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Represented By: Mark Whitney Lapham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smarttouch Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Represented By: Mark Whitney Lapham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Capital Investment, Inc. doing business as Nevada United Capital Investments, Inc.
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Represented By: Mark Whitney Lapham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: George C Schwelling
Represented By: Karl Y. Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Walter J. Antonell
Represented By: Karl Y. Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?