Christensen v. Baca et al
Petitioner: Derek Christensen
Respondent: Isidro Baca and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2014cv00157
Filed: March 25, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDERED that the amended petition (ECF No. 9) is DENIED in its entirety. FURTHER ORDERED that a certificate of appealability is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion to Dismiss (see order for details); granting 17 Motion for Leave to File Exhibits in Camera and Under Seal; allowing Respondents 45 days to answer Petitioner's remaining claims for relief. Petitioner to reply within 30 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/14/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Clerk shall electronically serve amended petition 9 on respondents. Respondents shall have 60 days to answer or otherwise respond to amended petition. Henceforth, petitioner shall serve upon AG copy of all pleadings submitted to the court. Hard copy of state court record exhibits shall be forwarded - for this case - to staff attorneys in Reno. Motions for appointment of counsel 8 and 10 are denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/19/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing Clerk to file the petition and motion for appointment of counsel; deferring decision on the motion for appointment of counsel; permitting Petitioner to file an amended petition; directing Clerk to send Petitioner four copies of 2254 form, one set of instructions, and a copy of the petition he submitted (mailed 8/26/2014). Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/26/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christensen v. Baca et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Isidro Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Derek Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?