Snow v. Mar et al
Plaintiff: John Oliver Snow
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services, Inc., Linda Klump, David A. Mar, E.K. McDaniel and Raranas
Case Number: 3:2014cv00290
Filed: June 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER that the Motion for Leave to File ECF No. 140 is GRANTED; the fifth Motion for Appointment of Counsel ECF No. 144 and Motion for Appointment of Investigator and Expert Witnesses ECF No. 153 are DENIED; Motion for Summary Judgment ECF No. 141 is GRANTED; Clerk directed to enter judgment and close case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting ECF No. 143 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Pretrial Order. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting ECF No. 138 Stipulation for Extesnion of Time to File Joint Pretrial Order. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/19/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting ECF No. 136 Stipulation : Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/2/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER adopting and accepting ECF Nos. 100 Report and Recommendation and 122 Report and Recommendation; Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction ECF No. 84 and Defendants' Motion fro Summary Judgment ECF No. 105 are DENIED; Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Romero Aranas ECF Nos. 99 and 117 are GRANTED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 02/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting ECF No. 74 Motion to Dismiss, dismissing Correctional Medical Services Inc from the case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/21/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER adopting and accepting ECF No. 93 Report and Recommendation; granting ECF No. 82 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Linda Klomp. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/17/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER adopting and accepting 71 Report and Recommendation; denying Defendants' 54 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/3/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDERED that the # 68 Motion to Reconsider is GRANTED : Plaintiff shall have until 2/25/2016 to serve Correctional Medical Services, Inc. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/25/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 6/18/2015, denying without prejudice 37 Motion to Inquire Status of the Amending of a Defendant. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 1 IFP application. Payment of an initial installment of filing fee not required. NDOC to pay Clerk from inmate account. The Clerk shall send a copy of this order to NDOC Chief of Inmate Services (mailed 5/26/2015) and USDC Finance Dept (NEF sent 5/26/2015), and shall e-serve this order and the complaint on the NV AG's Office (NEFs sent 5/26/2015). AG to advise court within 21 days re service. Answer due within 60 days for any defendants represented. Plaintiff shall serve defendants copy of all pleadings and include certificate of service. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 5/26/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE: INFORMAL SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS. The Clerk shall provide a courtesy copy of this order and the complaint to defendants' counsel (NEFs sent 7/25/2014). Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 7/24/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snow v. Mar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Klump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Mar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.K. McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raranas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Oliver Snow
Represented By: c/o Librarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?