Coleman v. LeGrand et al
Petitioner: Melvin Charles Coleman, Jr.
Respondent: Robert LeGrand and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2014cv00337
Filed: June 26, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 9/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 16 motion to extend time; granting 19 motion for leave to file under seal; directing Respondents to file a response to the 18 second amended petition within 90 days (by 5/12/2015). Petitioner to reply within 30 days thereafter. Any additional exhibits shall be filed with separate index. Hard copies of any exhibits shall be forwarded - for this case - to the staff attorneys in Reno. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/11/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Motion for Leave and Extension to File. (Second Amended Petition due by 12/9/2014.) Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/21/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FPD appointed as counsel for petitioner, with Jonathan M. Kirshbaum, Esq., appearing as petitioner's counsel of record. Amended Petition due within 30 days. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/9/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis 1 is granted. Clerk shall file petition and accompanying motion for appointment of counsel. Motion for appointment of counsel is granted. FPD provisionally app ointed and shall have 30 days to undertake representation or indicate inability to do so. Clerk shall add AG as counsel for respondents. Respondents' counsel shall enter notice of appearance within 21 days, but no further response required. Counsel shall send hard copy of exhibits, for this case, to the Reno Clerk's Office. Clerk shall send copy of this order to petitioner (along with copy of papers submitted), AG, FPD, and CJA Coordinator (sent via NEF or USPS 7/16/14). Clerk shall regenerate NEFS of prior filings to AG and FPD. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/15/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. LeGrand et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Melvin Charles Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Rene Valladares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert LeGrand
Represented By: Daniel M. Roche
Represented By: Catherine Cortez-Masto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Represented By: Daniel M. Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?