Gross v. Whiteman et al
Plaintiff: Harold E. Gross
Defendant: Warden Legrand, Caseworker Meegan, Sean Parsons and Lt. Whiteman
Case Number: 3:2014cv00365
Filed: July 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 9/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER denying Defendant's ECF No. 59 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 7/1/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DENYING # 38 Motion re disclosure of information Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/5/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER - Plaintiff's # 28 Motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/30/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis 1 is granted. No initial installment of filing fee due. Monthly payments required until full filing fee has been paid (copy of order sent to finance via NEF and NDOC v ia USPS). Clerk shall electronically serve copy of order and copy of amended complaint 6 on AG's Office (served via NEF 5/21/2015). AG's Office shall file notice advising Court re acceptance of service within 21 days. Answer for any represented defendants due within 60 days. Henceforth, Plaintiff shall serve upon defendants copy of all papers submitted to Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/21/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gross v. Whiteman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold E. Gross
Represented By: c/o Librarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Legrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caseworker Meegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Whiteman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?