Toribio-Ruiz v. Baca et al
Petitioner: Heriberto Toribio-Ruiz
Respondent: Isidro Baca and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2014cv00492
Filed: September 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting ECF No. 84 Motion to Extend Time. Petitioner will have up to and including December 28, 2020, to file a Reply to the Answer (ECF No. 83 ). Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/19/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER - Respondents' renewed motion to dismiss (ECF No. 73 ) is granted. Grounds 4(b), 4(c), 4(d), 4(e), 5, and 6 are dismissed as procedurally defaulted. It is further ordered that that Respondents will have 60 days from the date of e ntry of this order (9/14/2020) to file and serve an answer. Petitioner will have 45 days from the date on which the answer is served to file a reply. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting ECF No. 78 Motion to Extend Time : Response to ECF No. 73 Motion to Dismiss due by 3/31/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting ECF No. 74 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to ECF No. 73 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 2/28/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting ECF No. 68 Motion to Reopen, directing Clerk to reopen action and lift stay; directing Respondents to respond to ECF No. 31 Second Amended Petition within 60 days of service of an amended petition. Petitioner to reply within 30 days thereafter. (See order for specifics.) Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting ECF No. 62 Motion for Stay and Abeyance; this action is stayed pending exhaustion of the unexhausted claims; a motion to reopen to be filed (45) days after issuance of the remittitur by the NV Supreme Court; Clerk directed to administratively close case until court grants motion to reopen action. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting in part ECF No. 40 Motion to Dismiss -- Grounds 4(b), 4(c), 4(d), 4(e), 5, and 6 are unexhausted; giving Petitioner 30 days to file a motion for dismissal, partial dismissal, or other relief. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER - ECF No. 54 Motion for waiver is granted. It is further ECF No. 55 Motion to Extend Time is granted : Response to ECF No. 40 Motion to Dismiss due by 12/7/2016. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/8/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying ECF No. 34 Motion for More Definite Statement; directing Respondents to file an answer within 45 days. Petitioner to reply within 45 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/7/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 22 motion for leave to file second amended petition. Amended Petition due within 60 days. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/30/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 10 Motion to Extend Time : FPD shall have through March 4, 2015, to undertake direct representation of petitioner or to indicate to the Court his inability to represent petitioner in these proceedings. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/3/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - # 4 IFP Application is granted. Clerk shall file the petition. # 5 Motion for counsel is granted. FPD is provisionally appointed to represent petitioner. FPD shall notify court by 2/1/2015 re representation of petitioner. Clerk shall add AG as counsel for respondents. Clerk shall e-serve AG and FPD this order and petition. ( e-service performed on 1/2/2015 ) AG shall file notice of appearance by 1/22/2015. Any exhibits shall be filed as specified herein; and send hard copy to staff attorneys in Las Vegas. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/2/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 1/2/2015 to reflect copy of order mailed to P at NNCC (DRM).
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing Petitioner within 30 days to either submit an application to proceed IFP or pay the $5 filing fee; directing Clerk to send IFP form to Petitioner (mailed 11/21/2014). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/21/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toribio-Ruiz v. Baca et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Isidro Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Heriberto Toribio-Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?