Monroe v. Walker et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Monroe
Defendant: Warden Legrand and C/O Walker
Case Number: 3:2014cv00515
Filed: October 6, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration (ECF No. 38 ). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/9/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER accepting and adopting ECF No. 35 Report and Recommendation; dismissing without prejudice this action; directing Clerk to close case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER IFP Application 1 is granted. No initial installment fee due. Monthly payments due until full filing fee paid (copy of order sent via NEF to finance and via USPS to NDOC). Clerk shall electronically serve copy of this order a nd complaint 6 on AG's Office. Within 21 days, AG's Office shall file notice re acceptance of service. Henceforth, Plaintiff shall serve upon defendants copy of all documents submitted to the Court. Motion to appear at settlement conference telephonically 7 is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 6/3/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monroe v. Walker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Legrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?