Godoy v. LeGrand et al
Defendant: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Petitioner: Adolfo Godoy
Respondent: Robert LeGrand
Case Number: 3:2014cv00524
Filed: October 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER - The Second Amended Petition (ECF No. 21 ) is denied. A certificate of appealability is denied. Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/19/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER denying ECF No. 55 Motion to amend judgment. Reply to ECF No. 50 Answer due by 12/15/2017. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting in part Respondents' ECF No. 24 Motion to Dismiss; granting Petitioner's ECF No. 40 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss his Motion to Compel; denying as moot Petitioner's ECF No. 34 Motion to Compel; granting nunc pro tunc Petitioner's ECF Nos. 35 and 41 Motions to Extend Time; giving Petitioner 30 days to notify the Court re the unexhausted grounds. Respondents to answer remaining grounds for relief within 30 days of Petitioner's declaration. Petitioner to reply within 30 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 20 motion for leave to file longer than normal petition and directing respondents to respond to 21 second amended petition within 90 days. Courtesy copies of state court record exhibits must be mailed to staff attorney in Reno. Please see attached for additional details and deadlines. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - Petitioner shall file a second amended petition by 5/22/2015 as specified herein. Respondents need take no action until further order by this Court. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/7/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Clerk shall file the petition # 1 -1, 1 -2. Clerk shall file the Motion to add supplemental grounds # 1 -5. P's # 1 -5 Motion to add supplemental grounds is granted. Amended petition due by 2/11/2015. Clerk shall file Motion for counsel # 1 -6. P's Motion for counsel is denied. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/12/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Godoy v. LeGrand et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Adolfo Godoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert LeGrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?