Tripp v. Bisbee et al
Plaintiff: Walter Tripp
Defendant: Connie Bisbee, Tony Corda, Adam Endel and Susan Jackson
Case Number: 3:2015cv00030
Filed: January 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDERED that the Complaint is DISMISSED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall enter judgment and close the case. FURTHER ORDERED that a certificate of appealability is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying 10 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order and denying 11 Motion to Amend. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Clerk shall file complaint 1 -1. Complaint is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice. IFP Application 1 is denied as moot. This Court certifies that any in forma pauperis appeal from this order would not be taken "in good faith". Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/11/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tripp v. Bisbee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Bisbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Corda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Endel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Tripp
Represented By: c/o Librarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?