Manley v. Baker et al
Petitioner: Inmate Charles Manley
Respondent: Renee Baker and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2015cv00083
Filed: February 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that the petition is DISMISSED as untimely; respondents' motion for an extension of time (ECF No. 21 ) is GRANTED nunc pro tunc; petitioner's motion to clarify and authenticate supplemental exhibits (ECF No. 25 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; a certificate of appealability is DENIED; Clerk directed to enter final judgment in favor of respondents and against petitioner, dismissing this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER that respondents shall file a response to ECF No. 25 Motion for clarification by 3/2/2018; petitioner to have 21 days from service of the response to file a reply; requests for extension of the deadlines in this order will be considered in only the most compelling circumstances. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting ECF No. 19 Motion to Seal petitioner's presentence investigation report labeled as Exhibit 5 in ECF No. 18 Response. Respondents shall file exhibit under seal and serve supplemental exhibits by 12/29/2017. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting Petitioner's ECF No. 14 Motion for Leave to File a Reply; directing Clerk to file reply submitted as an exhibit to the motion; giving Respondents 30 days to file a response and to file indexed copies of any state court record exhibits relevant to the timeliness inquiry, including as to Petitioner's allegation of actual innocence, with a hard copy for staff not being required. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting 1 IFP application; denying without prejudice 4 Motion for Appointment of Counsel; denying 5 Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery; directing Clerk to file and e-serve 1 -1 petition; directing Petition er within 30 days to show cause that petition is timely, and allowing 30 days for Respondents to respond. Any exhibits shall be filed with separate index. Hard copies of any exhibits shall be forwarded to the staff attorneys in Reno. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/28/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manley v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Renee Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Inmate Charles Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?