Reberger v. Byrne et al
Plaintiff: Lance Reberger
Defendant: E. Boardman, Michael Byrne, Ely State Prison Personnel, R. Montoya and J. Parr
Case Number: 3:2015cv00143
Filed: March 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that this action is dismissed without prejudice based on Plaintiff's failure to file a complaint and pay the $400.00 filing fee in compliance with this Court's 03/06/2017, Order ECF No. 11 . It is further ordered that the Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 04/05/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER If Plaintiff wishes to pursue this action, he will submit a complaint to this Court on or before Friday, March 24, 2017. Clerk shall send to Plaintiff the approved form for filing a 42 U.S.C. § 1983 complaint, instructions for the s ame, and a copy of his motion for temporary restraining order (ECF No. 1-1). (Mailed to P 3/6/2016.) If Plaintiff wishes to pursue this action, he will pay the $400.00 filing fee on or before Friday, March 24, 2017. Clerk shall l send Plaintif f two (2) copies of this order. (Mailed to P 3/6/2016.) Plaintiff shall arrange to have one (1) copy of this order attached to the check paying the filing fee. If Plaintiff does not file a complaint and pay the full $400.00 filing fee on or before Friday, March 24, 2017, this action will be dismissed without prejudice. No extensions will be granted Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying without prejudice # 4 Motion; with leave to re-file the motion pending the Ninth Circuit's resolution of Plaintiff's three strikes status. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/4/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 2/4/2016 for font (DRM).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reberger v. Byrne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Boardman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ely State Prison Personnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Montoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Parr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Reberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?