Boney v. Smith et al
Petitioner: William D. Boney
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Gregory Smith
Case Number: 3:2015cv00193
Filed: April 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER that this action is dismissed without prejudice; Clerk directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re ECF No. 30 Notice. Clerk directed to update petitioner's address on docket and send petitioner a copy of ECF No. 26 Order. Petitioner will have until 2/5/2018 to respond to order. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re ECF No. 27 Returned Mail from ESP addressed to petitioner. Respondents are to provide petitioner's current address by 1/14/2018. If petitioner's address is not available to respondents and petitioner fails to update his address then this action will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER that ECF No. 24 Motion for Stay and Abeyance is denied; petitioner will have until 1/14/18 to respond to order or this action will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER - ECF No. 10 Motion to dismiss is granted as follows : 1. Ground 1(k) is dismissed with prejudice because it fails to state a cognizable federal habeas corpus claim. 2. Grounds 1(a), 1(b), 1(c), 1(d), 1(e), and 1(f) are unexhausted. Petitioner shall file sworn declaration or motion re exhaustion/abandoment/stay by 3/23/2017. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER IFP application 1 is granted. Clerk will file and electronically serve petition 1 -1 upon respondents (served via NEF 10/22/2015). Clerk shall add AG to docket. Respondents will have 45 days to answer or otherwise respond. Hard c opy of state court record exhibits must be forwarded to staff attorneys in Reno. Motion for appointment of counsel 1 -2 is denied. Henceforth, petitioner must serve upon AG copy of every pleading, motion, or other document submitted to the Court. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/22/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boney v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gregory Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William D. Boney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?