Franklin v. Arguello et al
Plaintiff: Darin J. Franklin
Defendant: Tania Arguello, Renee Baker, Michael Byrne, Catherine Cortez-Masto, James G. Cox, Dwayne Deal, Dean Heller, Michael Koehn, Eugene Murguia, Harry Reid, Brian Sandoval, Gregory Smith and Lisa Walsh
Case Number: 3:2015cv00196
Filed: April 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting ECF No. 137 Stipulation For Dismissal With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER approving ECF No. 135 Stipulation. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Judge Cobb's Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 129 ), is ADOPTED and ACCEPTED : Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 112 ) as to Counts I, II, IV and V are DENIED. Defendant M urguia's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 113 ) as to Counts I and II are GRANTED. Baker's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 113 ) as to Counts IV and V are DENIED. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judg ment insofar as Plaintiff seeks to recover damages against them in their official capacities is DENIED. Defendant' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 113 ) with respect to Plaintiff's claims for injunctive relief as Plaintiff has been released from prison and is no longer subject to the offending policies/practices is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting ECF No. 130 Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time re ECF No. 129 Report and Recommendation. Objections to R&R due by 2/14/2019. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 117 Motion to Extend Time : Response to ECF No. 112 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment due by 9/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER regarding ECF No. 99 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER that the Report and Recommendations ECF No. 65 is ADOPTED IN PART and REJECTED IN PART; the Motion to Dismiss ECF No. 33 is GRANTED INPART and DENIED IN PART; Plaintiff shall make a more definite statement as to whether he l ost good time credit as a result of the 04/05/2013 and 04/17/2013 disciplinary hearings within 28 days. Plaintiff may not further amend the FAC but shall file a separate statement addressing the issue. Dr. Koehn is entitled to summary judgment against Count III. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on Nunc Pro Tunc 05/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Reimbursement of Costs Related to Imposition of Sanctions (ECF No. 72 ) is GRANTED. Within fourteen (14) days of this order, the Office of the Attorney General of the State of Nevada shall reimburse Plaintiff in the amount of $17.63 for photocopying expenses. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 4/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 3/29/2017 before Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. Crtrm Administrator: Katie Lynn Ogden; Pla Counsel: Darin J. Franklin, Pro Se (Telephonically); Def Counsel: Heather Zana (Present)< /I>; Recorder: FTR; Recording start and end times: 10:03:49 a.m. - 10:33:43 a.m.; Courtroom: 2. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's 49 motion for sanctions is GRANTED. The sanctions imposed will consist of the Attorne y General's Office financially reimbursing Mr. Franklin monetary charges related to photocopying. Plaintiff shall have up to and including Friday, 4/7/2017, to file a motion for reimbursement of photocopying expenses. Defendants shall ha ve five (5) days upon receipt of Plaintiff's motion to respond to the motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's 67 motion to amend the 67 scheduling order is GRANTED. The following deadlines are revised: Discov ery Cut-off: Friday, 7/28/2017; Discovery Motions: Friday, 8/18/2017; Dispositive Motions: Thursday, 8/31/2017; Proposed Joint Pretrial Order: Friday, 9/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying 54 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike/Dismiss Defendants' Untimely Filed Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to reconsider (ECF No. 41 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER - Clerk shall e-SERVE AG this Order and ECF No. 22 Complaint upon AG. (E-service 8/11/2016; 22 Complaint via NEF regeneration.) AG shall by 9/1/2016 file notice re acceptance of service; and file under seal addresses for Ds for which servi ce not accepted. P shall file a motion re unserved Ds. Answer/response to complaint due by 10/10/2016. Henceforth P shall serve Ds a copy of every pleading submitted for consideration, together with a certificate of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/11/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying ECF No. 24 motion for reconsideration and denying as moot ECF No. 25 request for instruction. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin v. Arguello et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tania Arguello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Cortez-Masto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James G. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwayne Deal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Koehn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Murguia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darin J. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?