Leeds v. Baca et al
Petitioner: Robert Marc Leeds
Respondent: Baca and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2015cv00261
Filed: May 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 80 Motion to Extend Time : Reply to ECF No. 76 Answer due by 6/14/2019. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting ECF No. 77 Motion for Extension of Time to file reply to ECF No. 76 Answer to to the petition. Petitioner's Reply due by 4/15/2019. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 1/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER that Respondents' fifth unopposed motion for enlargement of time (ECF No. 74 ) is GRANTED. Respondents shall have to and including December 13, 2018, within which to file an answer to the remaining claims of the petition in this case. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER that Respondents' fourth unopposed motion for enlargement of time (ECF No. 72 ) is GRANTED. Respondents shall have to and including December 11, 2018, within which to file an answer to the remaining claims of the petition in this case. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER that Respondents' third unopposed motion for enlargement of time (ECF No. 70 ) is GRANTED. Respondents shall have to and including November 27, 2018, within which to file an answer to the remaining claims of the petition in this case. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER that Respondents' second unopposed motion for enlargement of time (ECF No. 68 ) is GRANTED. Respondents shall have to and including November 13, 2018, within which to file an answer to the remaining claims of the petition in this case. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting ECF No. 65 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time. Respondents' answer to petition due 9/27/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER that petitioner's motion to dismiss (ECF No. 63 ) is GRANTED, and Claim 13 of the third amended petition is hereby DISMISSED; respondents answer to all remaining claims in ECF No. 35 Third Amended Petition due by 8/11/2018 ; petitioner may file a reply within 30 days of service of an answer; any state court record and related exhibits filed herein by either petitioner or respondents shall be filed with a separate index of exhibits identifying the exhibits by number. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 7/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER that Respondents' Motion to Dismiss ECF No. 51 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as outlined in order; Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ECF No. 56 is GRANTED; Petitioner to filed either motion to dismiss or other appropriate relief by 7/8/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting ECF No. 59 Motion for Enlargement of Time to file Reply to ECF No. 51 Motion to Dismiss. Reply due by 5/2/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER that ECF No. 57 respondents' unopposed motion for enlargement of time to file a reply to petitioner's opposition to ECF No. 51 respondents' motion to dismiss is GRANTED; reply due by 4/18/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting ECF No. 53 Motion for an extension of time to file response to ECF No. 51 Motion to Dismiss. Petitioner's response due by 3/12/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER that Respondents' Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Opposition ECF No. 44 is GRANTED; Motions to Extend Time ECF Nos. 32 / 34 are GRANTED; Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File a Third Amended Petition ECF No . 24 is GRANTED; Petitioner's Motion to Partially Waive Local Rule IA 10-3(e) ECF No. 39 is GRANTED; Petitioner's Motions to Seal 38 / 40 are GRANTED; Clerk shall keep Exhibits 142-146 (ECF No. 38 -1-8) filed und er seal; Respondents Motion for Extension of Time ECF No. 31 in which to file a response to the third amended petition is GRANTED; Respondents SHALL FILE a response to the Third Amended Petition within 45 days; if and when respondents file an answer, petitioner shall have 45 days after service of the answer to file and serve a reply. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 08/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER setting schedule for further proceedings. Second amended petition due within 90 days (see attached for additional deadlines). Parties shall send courtesy copies of exhibits to staff attorney in Reno division. Petitioner shall file no further pro se documents. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/2/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting 4 IFP application; granting 5 Motion for Appointment of Counsel; appointing FPD to represent Petitioner; giving FPD 30 days to undertake direct representation or to indicate its inability to do so; directing C lerk to e-serve FPD with this order and the 1 -1 and 3 petitions (NEFs sent 10/29/2015); directing Clerk to add and e-serve NV AG with a copy of this order (NEF sent 10/29/2015); directing Respondents to enter notice of appearance within 10 days; directing Clerk to send a copy of this order to the CJA Coordinator (NEF sent 10/29/2015). Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/28/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leeds v. Baca et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Marc Leeds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?