Chemeon Surface Technology, LLC vs Metalast International, Inc, et al
Plaintiff: Chemeon Surface Technology, LLC
Defendant: Metalast International, Inc., Metalast, Inc., David M. Semas, Greg D. Semas, Wendi Semas-Fauria and Sierra Dorado, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv00294
Filed: June 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 627 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 2/23/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 617 ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING part the stipulation for extension of time (ECF No. 616 ). The parties shall file their closing arguments and proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law no later than 9:00 am on Monday, December 14, 2020. No further extensions of time shall be granted for any reason. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 12/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 604 ORDER sustaining, in part, and overruling, in part, Defendants' objection ECF No. 599 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 11/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HL)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 572 ORDER granting ECF No. 569 Motion as follows: - Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by Friday, May 1, 2020 Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 4/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 546 ORDER granting ECF No. 545 Stipulation : Plaintiff and Counter-Defendants' Response to ECF No. 540 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/10/2020. Defendant and Counterclaimant's Reply due by 1/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 12/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 518 ORDER granting ECF No. 517 Stipulation : Plaintiff's and Counter Defendants' Response to ECF No. 511 Motion for Leave is due by 9/30/2019. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 9/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER granting ECF No. 505 Stipulation : Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 7/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 493 ORDER approving ECF No. 492 Stipulation: Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/18/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 484 REASSIGNMENT ORDER that Case No. 3:19-cv-00125-LRH-CBC is reassigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry, and all future pleadings must bear case number 3:19-cv-00125-MMD-CBC. The Clerk is directed to change the file and docket to reflect this reassignment. Signed by Judges Miranda M. Du and Larry R. Hicks on 3/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 481 AMENDED ORDER that Defendant Greg Semas' motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 427 ) is granted; Plaintiff's claim against David Semas seeking cancellation of the Metalast trademark having registration No. 2963106 (ECF No. 348 at 4 1-43) is dismissed because Plaintiff lacks standing to bring it; Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a supplement to its supplemental brief (ECF No. 451 ) is denied; and Plaintiff's motion to seal (ECF No. 452 ) is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER that Defendant Greg Semas' motion for summary judgment ECF No. 427 is granted; Plaintiff's claim against David Semas seeking cancellation of the Metalast trademark having registration No. 2963106 (ECF No. 348 at 41-43) is dismissed; Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a supplement to its supplemental brief ECF No. 451 is denied; Plaintiff's motion to seal ECF No. 452 is denied as moot; Clerk is directed to enter judgment and close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ORDER approving ECF No. 455 Stipulation re ECF No. 451 Motion for Leave to File Supplement to Its Supplemental Brief in Support of Cancellation of the Metalast Trademark Registration: Response due by 1/22/2019. (See order for further details.) Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER granting ECF No. 446 Stipulation : Semas' Reply to ECF No. 441 Response re ECF No. 427 Motion for Summary Judgment, due by 5:00 PM on 10/16/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER granting ECF No. 434 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response to ECF No. 427 Motion for Summary Judgment. Response due by 9/10/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER granting ECF No. 431 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response to ECF No. 427 Greg Semas's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment (First Request). Chemeon Surface Technology, LLC's response due by 9/7/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER granting ECF No. 428 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Opposition to ECF No. 426 Motion of Entry of Order Cancelling Defendant/Counterclaimant David M. Semas' Federal Logo Mark Registrations (First Request). Response/opposition due by 8/3/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration (ECF No. 412 ) is granted in part and denied in part; summary judgment is granted in favor of Plaintiff on its declaratory relief claim of no trademark infringement; the parties are grant ed leave to file renewed motions for summary judgment on the remaining claims against Greg Semas by 7/26/2018. The normal briefing schedule will follow. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER granting ECF No. 423 Stipulation for Dismissal of Defendants Marc Harris and MHA Group with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/29/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER granting ECF No. 418 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Proposed Joint Pretrial Order. See order for details. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER granting ECF No. 414 Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule; Chemeon's reply brief to ECF No. 412 due by 5/11/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 411 AMENDED ORDER (Ref. Footnote 1) re ECF No. 398 Order granting in part and denying in part ECF Nos. 313 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, 315 Motion for Summary Judgment and 331 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER granting ECF No. 401 Stipulation to Extend Briefing Scheduled per ECF No. 398 Order on MSJ. Supplemental Briefs due by 4/10/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER granting in part and denying in part ECF Nos. 313 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, 315 Motion for Summary Judgment and 331 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants to provide supplement briefing due by 4/6/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER granting ECF No. 242 Chemeon's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint; parties to file a status report within (10) days re whether amendment will affection arguments in Chemoeon's pending MSJ ECF No. 315 . Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER that Plaintiff is awarded the sum of $11,625.62 in attorney's fees, payable to plaintiff's counsel within 60 days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 06/05/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER denying 294 Motion to Compel and for sanctions, and denying 301 countermotion for sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 5/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER granting 243 Chemeon's motion for sanctions. Chemeon is awarded its attorney's fees and costs for the expenses incurred in having to bring the motion. Chemeon shall file a statement of attorney's fee and costs pursuant to LR 54-14 within fourteen days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 4/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER re Attorney Certifications of document production. See order for full details. Certifications shall be produced by April 27, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 4/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER granting Metalast's ECF No. 223 Motion to Compel, directing Chemeon to produce the disputed discovery by 4/17/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 4/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER denying Harris's ECF No. 231 Motion to Exclude Evidence of Undisclosed Damages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 4/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER denying Metalast's ECF No. 186 Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 3/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 221 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 2/28/2017, granting ECF No. 184 Motion to Compel as follows (see order for details). (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting 151 plaintiff's motion to compel as it concerns the thirty-four documents submitted in camera. Defendants shall produce these documents to plaintiff's counsel within three court days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 9/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 6/17/2016, striking ECF Nos. 140 , 141 discovery requests and responses filed by Defendant Marc Harris. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 PROTECTIVE ORDER approving ECF No. 123 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 5/10/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting 71 Stipulation and Order to Participate in a Further Mediation and/or Settlement Conference before the Honorable Judge Greg(sic) Zive. Pursuant to the stipulation of counsel, it is ordered that a settlement conference/mediation conference in this matter and its related Bankruptcy matter be set before the Honorable Gregg Zive, US Bankruptcy Judge. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/23/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF and emailed to David_Lindersmith@nvb.uscourts.gov - PAV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chemeon Surface Technology, LLC vs Metalast International, Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chemeon Surface Technology, LLC
Represented By: Christopher B. Hadley
Represented By: Anthony L. Hall
Represented By: Tamara Reid
Represented By: Robert C. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalast International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalast, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Semas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg D. Semas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendi Semas-Fauria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sierra Dorado, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?