Howell v. Union Pacific Railroad Co. et al
Plaintiff: Jesus D. Diaz, Cheryl A Howell and Kevin Sparta
Defendant: Kinder Morgan GP, Inc., Kinder Morgan Operating L.P. "D", SFPP, L.P. and Union Pacific Railroad Co.
Case Number: 3:2015cv00317
Filed: June 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:2410 Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting ECF No. 160 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting ECF No. 158 Motion/Notice of Settlement and Request to Continue Stay. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company's ECF No. 152 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/29/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 135 PROTECTIVE ORDER re ECF No. 130 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 4/28/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 31 Unopposed Motion : Union Pacific Railroad Co. answer to 1 complaint due by 8/20/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 8/11/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howell v. Union Pacific Railroad Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus D. Diaz
Represented By: Brian David Nettles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl A Howell
Represented By: John W. Cowden
Represented By: John T. Cu
Represented By: Andrew G Giacomini
Represented By: Angela M. Higgins
Represented By: Nathan A Metcalf
Represented By: J. Robert Sears
Represented By: Michael J Van Zandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Sparta
Represented By: Brian David Nettles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinder Morgan GP, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinder Morgan Operating L.P. "D"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFPP, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?