United States of America v. Brinson et al
Plaintiff: USA United States of America
Defendant: Betty Brinson and Hughston Brinson
Case Number: 3:2015cv00359
Filed: July 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Howard D. McKibben
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER - The defendants' request to appear in person at the telephonic hearing set for March 1, 2017, at 10 a.m. (ECF No. 44 ) is approved. The plaintiff may continue to appear telephonically. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 2/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CONSENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 6/14/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 31 Motion to Admit Government Attorney Christopher Belen. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 4/20/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 11/24/2015. The Court cannot approve 16 Stipulated Protective Order. The parties have leave to submit a revised order that comports with Kamakana and Pintos. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Brinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Brinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hughston Brinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA United States of America
Represented By: Aurora R. Bryant
Represented By: Holly A. Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?