Byars v. Williams et al

Petitioner: Michael Dwayne Byars
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General and Bryan Williams, Sr.
Case Number: 3:2015cv00388
Filed: July 27, 2015
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 16, 2018 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that this action is DISMISSED; the petitioner is denied a certificate of appealability; Clerk directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
March 6, 2018 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the petition to either file a notice confirming his address or file a notice of change of address by 4/5/2018; this case will be dismissed if Byars fails to comply with order; the schedule for respondents' answer is vacated and the court will set a new deadline after petitioner's current address is resolved. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 29, 2018 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 27 Motion to Dismiss as to Ground 1; respondents to answer/respond to remaining claims in ECF No. 8 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by 3/30/2018; the schedule for further proceedings in Order ECF No. [2 4] shall remain in effect); petition will have (60) days following the filing of an answer to file a reply; respondents with then have (30) days to file a response to the reply. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 13, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that petitioner will have until 11/12/2017 to respond to the motion to dismiss. In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered 02/16/2017 ECF No. 24 shall remain in effect. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
July 20, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER giving Petitioner until 8/31/2017 to respond to ECF No. 27 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 16, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The stay of this action is vacated. The Clerk shallreopen this case. Answer to petition due by 4/17/2017. Reply due 60 days following service of answer; response to reply due 30 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 4, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Petitioner's 17 Request to File a Protective Writ (treated as a motion for relief from judgment); vacating 16 Judgment; staying action while Petitioner exhausts his unexhausted claims; directing Clerk to administratively close the case. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/4/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
December 2, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that petitioner's # 9 "Request for Stay and Abeyance [and] Withdrawal of Petition" is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that # 12 "Motion to Withdraw Petition" is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that respondents' # 14 Mot ion for Enlargement of Time is DENIED, as it is now moot. FURTHER ORDERED that this action is dismissed without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/2/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 25, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 4 motion to appoint counsel; directing Clerk to separately file petition, add AG as counsel for respondents, and electronically serve upon respondents copy of petition and this order (served via NEF 9/25/15); and directing respondents to answer or otherwise respond within 60 days. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/25/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byars v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Dwayne Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bryan Williams, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?