Mikovits v. Whittemore Peterson Institute, The
Plaintiff: Dr. Judy Mikovits
Defendant: Whittemore Peterson Institute, The
Interested Party: State of Nevada and United States Attorney
Case Number: 3:2015cv00409
Filed: August 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C Jones
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDERED that Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 33) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the qui tam claim brought on behalf of the United States is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to Plaintiff and DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to the United States. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the claim for retaliation is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall close this case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 26, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE to #33 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Judy Mikovits. (LE)
November 21, 2019 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to #33 Motion to Dismiss by Interested Party United States Attorney. (Wenthe, Roger)
October 28, 2019 Filing 35 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re ECF No. #34 Order, addressed to Robert Liskey. (KR)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER that the Clerk shall remove Plaintiff's counsel, Robert Liskey, from the docket; the Clerk shall mail copies of Orders (ECF Nos. 28 , #30 ), Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #33 ), Amended Complaint (ECF No. 18 ) and this order to Plaintiff at her last known address listed herein order; Plaintiff shall file a response to Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #33 ) by November 15, 2019; Plaintiff shall file proof of service on Defendant by November 25, 2019; if Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, then the Plaintiff's case may be dismissed. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/16/2019. (All copies mailed to P on this date). (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 23, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss by Interested Party United States Attorney. Responses due by 9/6/2019. (Wenthe, Roger)
April 15, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE TO THE COURT - Submission of Criminal Complaint, filed pro se by Plaintiff Judy Mikovits. (Attachments: #1 Notice - Submission of Criminal Affidavit and Criminal Complaint, #2 Exhibit) (KR)
March 15, 2019 Filing 31 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re ECF No. #30 Order, addressed to Robert Liskey. (LH)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER pursuant to ECF No. #29 Motion for Clarification of Order, and Relief from Previous Order re ECF No. 28 , Plaintiff must complete service of process within (90) days from the entry of this Order. Plaintiff's further unsupported requests for relief and reconsideration are DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/11/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 19, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION Notice of Motion and Motion for Clarification of Order, and Relief from Previous Order re ECF No. 28 Order, filed by Plaintiff Judy Mikovits. Responses due by 11/2/2018. (KW)
August 13, 2015 Case assigned to Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (BLG)
August 12, 2015 Filing 19 Case transferred in from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:14-cv-02797. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 27, 2015 Filing 14 SEALED MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Liskey, Robert). (jah). [Transferred from California Southern on 8/12/2015.] Modified on 8/28/2018 to denote sealed (KW).
November 24, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Whittemore Peterson Institute, The (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CASO68221) filed by Judy Mikovits. (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:14-cv-2797-BEN-WVG. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case.(kcm) [Transferred from California Southern on 8/12/2015.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mikovits v. Whittemore Peterson Institute, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of Nevada
Represented By: Adam P. Laxalt-AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States Attorney
Represented By: Roger W. Wenthe
Represented By: Steven W. Myhre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Judy Mikovits
Represented By: Robert Liskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whittemore Peterson Institute, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?