Moore v. Lewis et al
Plaintiff: Marlos M. Moore
Defendant: Officer Allen, James Cox, Sgt. Lewis and Brian Williams
Case Number: 3:2015cv00410
Filed: August 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER denying Plaintiff's ECF No. 45 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 5/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER accepting and adopting in its entirety ECF No. 37 R&R; granting Defendants' ECF No. 22 , 23 Motion for Summary Judgment; directing Clerk to enter judgment and close case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER - Defendants' motion for leave to file confidential documents under seal (ECF No. 21 ) is GRANTED. The exhibit (ECF No. 23 ) is filed and shall remain under seal. Plaintiffs request (ECF No. 32 ) is DENIED. The clerk shall SEND a copy request form to plaintiff for his use. (Mailed to P 4/10/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 4/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 3/2/2017, granting Defendants' ECF No. 28 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's ECF No. 27 Response; giving Plaintiff until 3/17/2017 to re-file his opposition (see order for details). (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING as moot ECF No. 16 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 10/18/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Lewis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlos M. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?