Peters v. Raymond et al
Plaintiff: Richard W. Peters
Defendant: Isidro Baca, Brooks, Nicki Brooks, Greg Cox, Sheryl Foster, R. Hannah, Sgt. Miller, Raymond and Lisa Walsh
Case Number: 3:2015cv00493
Filed: September 25, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER - Defendants' Motion to Continue Deadline for Filing Joint Pretrial Order (ECF No. 132 ) is GRANTED. The deadline to file the parties' proposed Joint Pretrial Order is VACATED to be reset at the appropriate time in the future. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER that the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation ECF No. 118 is ADOPTED and ACCEPTED; Plaintiff's Motion for Injunction ECF No. 109 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting ECF No. 120 Motion for Enlargement of Time re ECF No. 118 R&R. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER that Defendants' motion for leave to file medical records under seal (ECF No. 89 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion to Stay (ECF No. 81 ) is DENIED and his Motion for Enlargement of Time (ECF No. 101 ) is granted. Plaintiff is afforded until 7/15/2018 to submit his opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 88 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER that ECF No. 76 Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting ECF No. 66 Motion for Enlargement of Time to reply to ECF No. 63 Motion for Court to Replace All Documents within Case at State Expense. Reply due by 1/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying 50 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay and 51 Plaintiff's Motion for Physical and Mental Examination. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 6/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting Plaintiff's ECF No. 1 IFP application - NDOC to pay Clerk from inmate account (copy of order sent to Finance and NDOC Chief of Inmate Services); denying ECF Nos. 17 , 18 , and 23 motions; directing Clerk to e-s erve NV AG with this order and ECF No. 11 Amended Complaint (NEFs sent 11/18/2016). AG to advise Court within 21 days re service. Answer due within 60 days for any defendants represented. Plaintiff shall serve defendants copy of all pleadings and include certificate of service. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 11/17/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peters v. Raymond et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isidro Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicki Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Hannah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard W. Peters
Represented By: c/o Librarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?