Kinford v. Pincock et al
Plaintiff: Steven Kinford
Defendant: Nevada Department of Corrections and James Pincock
Case Number: 3:2015cv00512
Filed: October 13, 2015
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER denying Plaintiff's ECF No. 75 Motion to Reconsider. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Adopting and Accepting ECF No. 65 Report and Recommendation : The previously dismissed claims against Dr. Pincock is without jurisdiction to consider the claims in the Third Amended Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the claims aga inst Warden Baca and Warden Neven are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion for Mediation (ECF # 64 ) is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDERED that the Motion for Relief from Judgment (ECF No. 51 ) and the Motion to File Amended Complaint (ECF No. 56 ) are GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall DETACH and FILE the Third Amended Complaint (ECF No. 56 -1), and the Magist rate Judge shall PREPARE a report and recommendation under 28 U.S.C. § 1915A in the ordinary course. FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. 55 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER indicating that the Court would grant ECF No. 51 Motion for Relief from Judgment if the Court of Appeals were to remand for that purpose. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 7/8/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying without prejudice ECF No. 22 Motion for Leave to File and denying as moot ECF No. 23 Motion to Have Filings Electronically Served on the "New Defendants". Second amended complaint to cure deficiencies with respect to Baca and Neven due within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 6/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that Court will not enter screening order in this case. NDOC and NNCC dismissed with prejudice. This case shall proceed on normal litigation track as guided by FRCP. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/30/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinford v. Pincock et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Kinford
Represented By: c/o Librarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Pincock
Represented By: Edward J. Lemons
Represented By: Alice C Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?