Reberger v. Koehn et al
Plaintiff: Lance Reberger
Defendant: Romeo Aranas, D. Jones and Michael Koehn
Case Number: 3:2015cv00551
Filed: November 12, 2015
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER ACCEPTING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - The Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 267 ) is accepted and adopted in its entirety. Defendants' motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 189 ) is granted. Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in accordance with this order and close the case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER that the Court denies the motions filed as ECF Nos. 180 , 223 , 184 , 250 , 251 , 194 , 204 , 205 , 186 , and 198 ; the Court grants the motions filed as ECF Nos. 197 , 218 , and 227 nunc pro tunc; the motion to seal (ECF No. 181 ) is granted; Clerk directed to strike Plaintiff's objection (ECF No. 188 ) and request for judicial notice (ECF No. 239 ). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER denying 150 Objection to reservation of rights; 156 Motion to Compel; and 157 Motion to Compel. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Cooke on 1/24/18.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER re ECF No. 152 Case Management Report; Defendants must file and serve plaintiff copies of all documents referenced in case management report by 1/19/2018; this case is STAYED; and ECF No. 129 is granted nunc pro tunc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 1/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER that ECF No. 103 Plaintiff's Objection is overruled; clerk directed to strike ECF No. 122 Plaintiff's Reply. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Extend Time (ECF No. 158 ): Defendants shall have to and including Wednesday, December 6, 2017 to respond to plaintiff's objections (ECF No. 155 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 11/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Plaintiff's motion for the court to accept his errata with his signature page (ECF No. 79 ) to his motion to strike is GRANTED. However, the court's order denying plaintiff's motion to strike (ECF No. 84 ) remains in full force and effect. Plaintiff's motion for a more definite statement from defendants' answer to second amended complaint (ECF No. 86 ) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 6/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MINUTE ORDER DENYING in part and GRANTING in part ECF No. 67 Motion to obtain address. The Clerk shall ISSUE a summons for Michael Koehn and send the same to the USM with the address provided under seal (ECF No. 66 ). (Delivered to USM 2/28/2017.) Clerk shall also SEND a copy of the second amended complaint (ECF No. 8 ), a copy of the screening order (ECF No. 9 ), and a copy of this order to the USM for service on the defendant. (Delivered to USM 2/28/2017.) Clerk s hall SEND to plaintiff one USM-285 form. (Mailed to P 2/28/2017.) Plaintiff shall have until Friday, March 10, 2017, to complete the USM-285 service form and return it to the USM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 2/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting Plaintiff's ECF No. 1 IFP application; NDOC to pay Clerk from inmate account (copy of order sent to Finance and NDOC Chief of Inmate Services); directing Clerk to e-serve NV AG with this order and the ECF No. 8 Second Amended Complaint (Second Amended complaint to AG via NEF regeneration 01/23/2017); directing AG to advise Court by 02/13/2017 re acceptance of service; if service cannot be accepted, Plaintiff shall file a motion identifying the unserved def endants(s), requesting issuance of a summons and specifying full name/address of the defendant(s); answer/response due by 03/24/2017 for any defendants represented; Plaintiff shall serve defendants a copy of all pleadings and include certificate of service. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 01/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting in part ECF No. 40 Motion for an Extension of Copy Work Limit. NDOC will extend Plaintiff's prison copy work limit by another $5.00. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that ECF Nos. 38 Motion to Strike a Notice of Submi ssion, 41 Motion for Order Authorizing Early Review of all of Plaintiff's Medical Records, and 42 Motion to Receive a Copy of a Minute Order are denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that ECF No. 13 Motion to File Plaintiff's Me dical Records Under Seal is granted. Plaintiff's Response to ECF No. 29 Motion for Summary Judgment is due by 11/9/2016 and Defendants' Reply is due by 11/28/2016. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting ECF No. 33 Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiff shall file one reponse to ECF No. 14 Notice/Motion and ECF No. 29 Motion for Summary Judgment by 10/24/2016. Defendants to file Reply to motions by 10/31/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 10/12/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) Modified on 10/13/2016 to add name of ECF doc (KW).
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying ECF No. 20 Motion for Court Appointed Investigator or Pro Bono Counsel to Assist Only to Gather Evidence in Discovery; granting in part and denying in part ECF No. 21 for Extra $30 on NDOC Copy Machine - in the amount of $5.00; denying ECF No. 23 Motion to Strike. Plaintiff is granted additional time to respond to Defendants' notice/motion ECF No. 14 . Plaintiff's Response due by 10/7/2016 and Defendants' Reply is due by 10/14/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 09/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re 14 Notice Negating Plaintiff's Claims of Imminent Harm Responses due by 9/29/2016, directing Plaintiff to respond within 14 days. Defendants may reply within 7 days after response. Clerk is directed to serve Defendant's ECF No. 14 Notice and ECF No. 15 Sealed Submission of Exhibit B on Plaintiff (mailed 9/15/2016). Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 9/15/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reberger v. Koehn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romeo Aranas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Koehn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Reberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?