Anderson v. NDOC et al
Plaintiff: Joseph M Anderson
Defendant: J. Ball, Quentin Bryne, Tara Carpenter, James Greg Cox, East, Sheryl Foster, Kara Krause, K. LeGrand, Robert LeGrand, Eldon K McDaniel, Nevada Department of Corrections, Valaree Olivas, J. Parks and R. Stogner
Case Number: 3:2016cv00056
Filed: February 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 197 Motion to Extend Time : Response to ECF No. 193 Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER re 184 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave of Court to File Supporting Exhibits in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have to and including Friday, September 7, 2018, in which to advise the court of the relevancy as to each proposed exhibit Plaintiff wishes the court (and Defendant) to still consider with respect to his motion for partial summary judgment. Plaintiff will not have to refile the exhibits.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all briefing on Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 183 is STAYED until the court rules on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave of Court to File Supporting Exhibits in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 184 . Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER that Plaintiff's Rule 72(a) objection (ECF No. 168 ) is OVERRULED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion to Move the Settlement Conference (ECF No. 171 ) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER denying Defendants' ECF No. 60 Motion to Reconsider; granting Defendants' ECF No. 78 Motion for Clarification; denying Plaintiff's 80 Motion to Reconsider. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 10/18/2017. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Release of Court Document ECF No. 98 is GRANTED to the extent that the Clerk shall resend Plaintiff a copy of the courts order denying Plaintiffs third motion for appointment of counsel ECF No. 81 (NEF regenerated to P via LCC law library on 10/18/2017); Plaintiff's request to issue a temporary restraining order is DENIED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 10/12/2017, granting in part Plaintiff's ECF No. 90 Motion to Extend Legal Copywork Limit, allowing increase of $15.00 (copy of order mailed to NDOC Chief of Inmate Services). (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 JUDGMENT - Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment (ECFNo. 27 ) is GRANTED, EXCEPT as to the retaliation claim against Defendant Parks. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 9/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER - Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 63 ) is ADOPTED AND ACCEPTED : Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint (ECF No. 45 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the District Judge enter an order GRANTING ECF No. 27 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, EXCEPT the motion should be DENIED as to the retaliation claim against Defendant Parks. Objections to R&R due by 8/31/2017. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 08/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Plaintiff's ECF No. 45 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint be denied. Objections to R&R due by 8/18/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying 36 Plaintiff's Motion to Deny Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DENYING ECF Nos. 47 , 48 Objections. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER denying 57 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave of Court to Conduct Depositions by Written Questions. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 7/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 29 Motion to Extend Time : Response to ECF No. 27 Motion for Summary Judgment due byWednesday 5/31/2017. Plaintiff's motion is DENIED in other respects. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 4/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER directing Clerk to e-serve a copy of this order and Plaintiff's ECF No. 7 Amended Complaint on NV AG (NEFs sent 2/2/2017). AG to advise Court within 21 days re service. Answer due within 60 days for any defendants represented. Plaintiff shall serve defendants copy of all pleadings and include certificate of service. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/2/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. NDOC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph M Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Ball
Represented By: D. Randall Gilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quentin Bryne
Represented By: D. Randall Gilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Carpenter
Represented By: D. Randall Gilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Greg Cox
Represented By: D. Randall Gilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East
Represented By: D. Randall Gilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl Foster
Represented By: D. Randall Gilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kara Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. LeGrand
Represented By: D. Randall Gilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert LeGrand
Represented By: D. Randall Gilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eldon K McDaniel
Represented By: D. Randall Gilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department of Corrections
Represented By: D. Randall Gilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valaree Olivas
Represented By: D. Randall Gilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Parks
Represented By: D. Randall Gilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Stogner
Represented By: D. Randall Gilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?