Bresselsmith v. Stubbs
Plaintiff: David Bresselsmith
Defendant: Stubbs
Case Number: 3:2016cv00102
Filed: February 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying 25 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant to Execute and Fulfill Settlement Agreement Contract. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER dismissing with prejudice this action per ECF No. 23 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting Plaintiff's ECF No. 1 IFP application - NDOC to pay Clerk from inmate account (copy of order sent to Finance and NDOC Chief of Inmate Services); directing Clerk to e-serve NV AG with this order and the ECF No. 7 Amende d Complaint (NEFs sent 12/27/2016); directing AG to advise Court within 21 days re acceptance of service. Answer due within 60 days for any defendants represented. Plaintiff shall serve defendants copy of all pleadings and include certificate of service. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/27/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bresselsmith v. Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bresselsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?