Bank of America, N.A. v. North Truckee Townhomes Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: E. Alan Tiras and North Truckee Townhomes Homeowners Association
Case Number: 3:2016cv00135
Filed: March 8, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER OF FINAL JUDGMENT AND QUIET TITLE approving ECF No. 82 Stipulated/Consent Judgment, dismissing with prejudice all claims in this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting ECF No. 75 Motion to Extend Time : Dispositive Motions due by 2/1/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting ECF No. 70 Motion to Remove Attorney Karen A. Whelan and Jesse A. Ransom from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 10/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting ECF No. 54 Motion to Remove Attorney Matthew I. Knepper, Esq. from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 1/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 JUDGMENT in favor of E. Alan Tiras. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER lifting temporary stay. Pending motions that were denied without prejudice when the stay was imposed may be refiled within 30 days. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Staying Case Pending Issuance of Mandate in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank and Denying Pending Motions without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. North Truckee Townhomes Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Matthew I Knepper
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Alan Tiras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Truckee Townhomes Homeowners Association
Represented By: Thomas E. McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?