Bank of America, N.A., successor by merger to BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, v. Southwest Meadows Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC, LVDG LLC, Southwest Meadows, Southwest Meadows Homeowners Association and Thunder Properties, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00183
Filed: March 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting ECF No. 91 Joint Motion to Extend Time. Notice of Appeal is due by 6/3/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting ECF No. 85 Motion to Remove Attorney Rebekkah B Bodoff and Vatana Lay from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 3/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting ECF No. 81 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to ECF No. 72 Motion for Summary Judgment. Response due by 03/20/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting ECF No. 77 Stipulation to Extend re ECF No. 72 Motion for Summary Judgment (First Request): Defendants LVDG and Thunder Properties, Inc.'s response/opposition due by 3/8/2019. BANA's reply due by 3/21/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting ECF No. 73 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice as to Southwest Meadows. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER lifting temporary stay. Pending motions that were denied without prejudice when the stay was imposed may be refiled within 30 days. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Staying Case Pending Issuance of Mandate in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank and Denying Pending Motions without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting ECF No. 32 Stipulation to withdraw specified grounds in ECF No. 21 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A., successor by merger to BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, v. Southwest Meadows Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVDG LLC
Represented By: Roger P. Croteau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Meadows Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thunder Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Roger P. Croteau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Allison R. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?