McCullough v. Machado et al
Plaintiff: John Harold McCullough
Defendant: Jerry Allen, Bjerke, Dickerman, Richard Machado, Gary Rogers and Stevens
Case Number: 3:2016cv00225
Filed: April 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER approving ECF No. 83 Stipulation of Dismissal, dismissing with prejudice this action. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER that the Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke ECF No. 63 is accepted and adopted; Defendants' motion for partial dismissal ECF No. 48 is granted; District Attorney Bryce Shields, County Commi ssioners Robert McDougal, Carol Shank, Larry Rackley, and Deputy Sheriff Jerry Reid are dismissed; Count VII based upon the Prison Rape Elimination Act is dismissed. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting ECF No. 55 Motion for Disassociation of Counsel : Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 3/20/2018. ( Attorney Adam L Woodrum terminated obo Richard Machado, Thomas Bjerke, Jerry Allen, Don Poffenroth, Philipp Pasqual, and Jerry Reid. ) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting ECF No. 44 Motion for Disassociation of Counsel as to Kevin A. Pick and Joseph E. Balkenbush. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 2/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER that the Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke ECF No. 35 is accepted and adopted in its entirety; Clerk directed to file Second Amended Complaint ECF No. 30 , 30 -1; Counts I, II, III, IV, V, VI and VII will proceed; Count VIII is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's motion to amend (ECF No. 30 ) be GRANTED; that the Clerk FILE the second amended complaint (ECF No. 30 ); that Counts I, II, III, IV, V, VI, and VII of the second amended complaint PROCEED; and that Count VIII be DISMISSED. Objections to R&R due by 9/13/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 8/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Count (ECF No. 24 ). Plaintiff shall have until Wednesday, May 31, 2017 to either withdraw his previous motion to amend and file a revised motion, or to notify the court that he wishes to proceed with his original motion to amend (ECF No. 16 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 5/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCullough v. Machado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bjerke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dickerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Machado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Harold McCullough
Represented By: c/o Librarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?