Castillo v. Western Range Association et al

Plaintiff: Abel Cantaro Castillo
Defendant: El Tehon Sheep Company, Melchor Gragirena and Western Range Association
Case Number: 3:2016cv00237
Filed: May 3, 2016
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2018 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 145 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Object to Bills of Cost [ECF Nos. 142 , 143 , and 144 ) and for Leave to File a Unified Objection. Plaintiffs' response due by 3/19/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
February 13, 2018 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the Motions to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint (ECF Nos. 117 , 118 , 121 , 124 ) are GRANTED. This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (ECF No. 128 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is hereby instructed to close the case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 13, 2017 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot ECF Nos. 35 and 37 Motions to Dismiss the original Complaint; granting ECF Nos. 55 , 66 , and 74 Motions to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint; Plaintiffs have until 05/13/2017 to file a second amended complaint remedying the defects; granting ECF No. 75 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 04/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 18, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 48 Stipulation and Order to Extend Time for Responding to ECF No. 45 First Amended Complaint (First Request). Defendants El Tehon Sheep Company and Melchor Gragirena answer/response due 11/10/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 10/18/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo v. Western Range Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abel Cantaro Castillo
Represented By: Alexander Hood
Represented By: Dermot Lynch
Represented By: Christopher W. Mixson
Represented By: Bradley Scott Schrager
Represented By: Don Springmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Tehon Sheep Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melchor Gragirena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Range Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?