Wurm et al v. Mid-Century Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Kristen Kennedy and Michael Wurm
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Exchange and Mid-Century Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2016cv00244
Filed: May 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Howard D. McKibben
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDERED that the motion for judgment on the pleadings (ECF No. 39 ) is denied without prejudice to renew as a motion for summary judgment at the close of discovery. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for sanctions pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11 (ECF No. 49 ) is denied. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 8/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying ECF No. 43 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; Plaintiff's Opposition to ECF No. 39 is stricken; Plaintiff shall file an opposition to the motion for judgment on the pleadings ECF No. 39 that complies with Local Rule 7-3(b) on or before 06/12/2017; Markel Insurance Company shall file a reply on or before 06/26/2017; the Stipulation to extend the deadline for Markel Insurance Company to file a reply in support ECF No. 45 is granted in part. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 06/08/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER - Counsel Michelle Press shall have until September 10, 2016, to file the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition pursuant to Local Rule IA 11-2. (See ECF No. 23 (Second Notice to Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule IA 11-2)). Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 8/3/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wurm et al v. Mid-Century Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Exchange
Represented By: David J. Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-Century Insurance Company
Represented By: David J. Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Kennedy
Represented By: Thomas R Brennan
Represented By: Sean P. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wurm
Represented By: Thomas R Brennan
Represented By: Sean P. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?