U.S. Bank National Association, not in its Individual Capacity but Solely as Trustee of SW REMIC Trust 2015-1 c/o Seneca Mortgage Servicing LLC 611 Jamison Road, Elma, NY 14059 v. Casoleil Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC, Casoleil Homeowners Association, LVDG, LLC and Thunder Properties, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00307
Filed: June 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting ECF No. 76 BANA's motion for summary judgment; dismissing as moot BANA's claims for breach of NRS § 116.1113 and wrongful foreclosure; denying as moot ECF No. 75 the HOA's motion for summary judgment; dismissing as moot BANA's claim for injunctive relief against Thunder; and directing the Clerk to enter judgment in favor of BANA and close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting ECF No. 79 Stipulation : BANA's Reply to ECF No. 78 Response re ECF No. 76 Motion for summary judgment due by 12/28/2018. Casoleil's Reply to ECF NO. 77 Response re ECF No. 75 Motion for summary judgment due by 12/28/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting ECF No. 73 Stipulation: Attorney Karen A. Whelan terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting ECF No. 70 Stipulation Regading Dispositive Motion Deadline. Deadline to re-file Dispositive Motions due by 11/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting ECF No. 68 Joint Status Report with Stipulation to Set Discovery and Dispositive Motions Filing Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting ECF No. 62 Stipulation : Reply to ECF No. 61 Response re ECF No. 54 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/26/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting ECF No. 56 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to ECF No. 55 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants' response due 1/26/2018. Reply due 2/16/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH) Modified on 12/21/2017 to correct error (LH).
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER - S. Bank National Association, Thunder Properties, Inc., and LVDG LLC's Joint Motion to Stay (ECF No. 27 ) is granted. This action is temporarily stayed until resolution of the certiorari proceedings before the United States Supreme Co urt in Bourne Valley and/or Saticoy Bay. The parties must file a status report within 15 days from such resolution. The pending Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 19 ) is denied without prejudice and may be refiled within 30 days after the stay is lifted. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER lifting temporary stay. Pending motions that were denied without prejudice when the stay was imposed may be refiled within 30 days. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER staying case pending the Ninth Circuit's issuance of the mandate in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/23/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association, not in its Individual Capacity but Solely as Trustee of SW REMIC Trust 2015-1 c/o Seneca Mortgage Servicing LLC 611 Jamison Road, Elma, NY 14059 v. Casoleil Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casoleil Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVDG, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thunder Properties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Christine M. Parvan
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?