Griffith v. Aranas, et al.
Plaintiff: Roy Griffith
Defendant: Romeo Aranas, Greg Cox and Karen Gedney
Case Number: 3:2016cv00309
Filed: June 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting ECF No. 72 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 67 Stipulation to vacate Evidentiary Hearing set for 5/7/2018 at 9:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 5 before Judge Miranda M. Du. The stipulation and order for dismissal with prejudice is due within 30 days. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting ECF No. 65 Motion to Produce Inmate Roy Griffith (#27757) for Evidentiary Hearing. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting Joint Stipulation to continue evidentiary hearing date (ECF No. 61 .) The evidentiary hearing set for 3/27/2018 at 9:00 AM is reset to 5/7/2018 at 09:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 5 before Judge Miranda M. Du. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER - The Court advises counsel for the parties to be prepared to address the issues specified herein at the impending evidentiary hearing as these issues may bear on the irreparable harm and likelihood of success factors the Court must consider in evaluating Plaintiff's request for preliminary injunctive relief. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER that this case is referred to the Pro Bono Program for appointment of counsel; Clerk to forward this order to Pro Bono Liaison (e-served on 01/09/2018); Motion to Extend Time ECF No. 33 is granted re 32 Report and Recommendation; Court to issue a separate order scheduling evidentiary hearing even if pro bono counsel is not located. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ECF No. 1 is GRANTED; NDOC to pay Clerk from inmate account (copy of order sent to Finance and NDOC Chief of Inmate Services on 04/25/2017); Clerk directed to e-serve a copy of this order and Plaintiff's Complaint ECF No. 4 on AG (e-service of order and NEF regeneration of ECF No. 4 on 04/25/2017) ; directing AG to advise Court by 05/16/2017 re acceptance of service; if service cannot be a ccepted, Plaintiff shall file a motion identifying the unserved defendants(s), requesting issuance of a summons and specifying full name/address of the defendant(s); answer/response due by 06/24/2017 for any defendants represented; Plaintiff shall serve defendants a copy of all pleadings and include certificate of service. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 04/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffith v. Aranas, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romeo Aranas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Gedney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Griffith
Represented By: c/o Librarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?