Elias v. Geico General Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Mahealani Elias
Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2016cv00327
Filed: June 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Howard D. McKibben
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635 Breach of Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting ECF No. 96 Stipulation : This action is dismissed with prejudice, said dismissal to constitute a retraxit, the parties to the dismissal to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 11/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER FOR PREPARATION OF JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Proposed Jury Instructions due by Tuesday, 11/28/2017. See attached Order. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 10/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PR)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER denying as moot Defendant's ECF No. 54 Motion in Limine to Exclude Future Medical Expenses. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 10/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDERED that Geico's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 33 ) is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the jury trial in this case is set for December 5, 2017, at 9:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 4. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the cale ndar call is set for November 21, 2017, at 9:30 AM in Reno Courtroom 4. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the pretrial order is due by July 6, 2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that proposed voir dire and proposed jury instructions are due by November 28, 2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that motions in limine shall be filed by September 6, 2017. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 6/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elias v. Geico General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mahealani Elias
Represented By: Frank W. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company
Represented By: Philip A. John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?